Atari Interactive, Inc. v. Teespring, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00111 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2019 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Teespring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atari Interactive, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Regarding Location Change for Judge Jon S. Tigar
Wed 08/21 4:45 PM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019: Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 08/15 2:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/18/19 TO 11/12/19. Judge Tigar's Case Management Conference calendar will shift from Monday afternoons to Tuesday afternoons, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 07/01 4:36 PM
Order to Continue Case Management Statement by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due 11/8/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) |
|
24 | 24
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Mon 07/01 1:33 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lauritsen, Eric) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 06/28 5:14 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weibell, Anthony) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 06/28 5:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Teespring, Inc..(Weibell, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Anthony J Weibell | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 06/28 4:56 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint filed by Teespring, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
adr
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018
Thu 06/27 10:13 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmfS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/28 8:22 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Teespring, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 28, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/27 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Carl Lauritsen (Lauritsen, Eric) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/27 1:01 PM
STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Teespring, Inc..(Weibell, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Anthony J Weibell | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 03/27 12:52 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint filed by Teespring, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/27 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Knoll on Behalf of Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Knoll, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 01/17 12:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 01/16 12:45 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Teespring, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/16 10:28 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/2019.(bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 01/16 9:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Tue 01/08 8:24 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Wesley, Keith) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Tue 01/08 8:21 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Wesley, Keith) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 01/08 7:56 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Atari Interactive, Inc. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 01/08 7:51 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/08 7:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12984901.). Filed byAtari Interactive, Inc..(Wesley, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |