Richard McKenzie v. The Regents of The University of California et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 8:14-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 10:49 PM PST |
Defendant
Coursera Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Daphne Koller
|
|
Defendant
Gary Matkin
|
|
Defendant
The Regents of The University of California
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard McKenzie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Richard McKenzie. Dismissal is with prejudice. (McNulty, Elizabeth) | |
Friday, February 21, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2014 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) | |
5 | 5 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) | |
Monday, February 03, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendants Coursera Inc, Daphne Koller, Gary Matkin, The Regents of The University of California. (dg) (dg). | |
3 | 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dg) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Richard McKenzie. (dg) (dg). | |
Sunday, February 03, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Coursera Inc, Does, Daphne Koller, Gary Matkin, The Regents of The University of California. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Richard McKenzie.(dg) (dg). | |
Att: 1 (2/6/2014) CV-18 |