Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:19-bk-50042
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Dec 20, 2019

Debtor
Innovative Mattress Solutions, LLC
1056 Wellington Way Ste 200
Lexington, KY 40513-2000
Represented By
Laura Day DelCotto
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jamie L. Harris
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Heather M Thacker
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507
Represented By
John L. Daugherty
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/16/2021 12:01 PM EDT
Monday, March 15, 2021
729 729 misc Report (Post Confirmation) Mon 03/15 10:43 AM
Quarterly Post Confirmation Report for Filing Period Ending December 31, 2020, filed by Liquidating Trustee. (Young, Gina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bank Statements