Brown Immobilien LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-50042
Lead case is: 5:19-bk-50042
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:19-bk-50050 |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Brown Immobilien LLC
1056 Wellington Way Ste 200
Lexington, KY 40513-2000 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 12:00 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 05/18 11:10 AM
Final Decree, discharging Trustee, if applicable. CASE CLOSED. (bjp) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Fri 04/05 8:52 AM
Receipt Number 9798726, Fee Amount 350.00, for Complaint (Doc. #395) filed in Lead Case Number 19-50042 Complaint Applies to the other ten jointly administered cases as well 19-50043 19-50044 19-50045 19-50046 19-50047 19-50048 19-50049 19-50050 ; 19-50051 19-50052 (tgw) |
||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held
Fri 02/15 12:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 02/19 2:13 PM
Receipt Number 9725411, Fee Amount $181.00 for Motion to Approve (Doc. 277) filed in Lead Case Number 19-50042 Motion applies to all of the Jointly Administered Cases 19-50042 thru 19-50052 (baa) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 02/19 2:25 PM
Receipt Number 9725411, Fee Amount $181.00 for Motion to Sell (Doc. 279) filed in Lead Case Number 19-50042 Motion applies to all of the Jointly Administered Cases 19-50042 thru 19-50052 (baa) |
||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Amended Schedules A-H, Mailing Matrix
Wed 02/13 2:16 PM
Amended Schedule(s) A, B, D, E, F, G, H, and Amended Mailing Matrix - Adding Creditors or Parties in Interest Fee Amount $31 filed by Brown Immobilien LLC, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs, filed by Brown Immobilien LLC. (DelCotto, Laura Day) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 02/13 2:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules A-H, Mailing Matrix 19-50050 grs) [misc,amdschat] ( 31.00). Receipt number 9721544, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Disclosure of Fees by Attorney for Debtor
Fri 01/25 3:57 PM
Schedule(s) filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,, filed by Brown Immobilien LLC, Statement of Financial Affairs, filed by Brown Immobilien LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, , filed by Brown Immobilien LLC, Disclosure of Fees filed by Laura Day DelCotto Attorney for Debtor, Equity Security Holders , filed by on behalf of Brown Immobilien LLC. (DelCotto, Laura Day) |
|
Sunday, January 20, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 01/21 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 01/20/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11(corporation)
Fri 01/18 10:33 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Hearing Room 529, Lexington. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 4/16/2019. (nbw) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Entry re Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/14 3:13 PM
A notice of appearance has been filed adding only Matthew D. Ellison to the ECF System as counsel on behalf of United Bank, a Virginia banking corporation. Pursuant to Section VI of the Administrative Procedures Manual, the electronic filing of a document using the Certified User's ECF login and password, adds the Certified User as counsel of record for the party on whose behalf the document was filed. Therefore, a separate document must be filed electronically by any other attorneys named in the notice of appearance who would like to be added to this case. (nbw) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 01/14 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
Sunday, January 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 01/14 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
File (BNC)
Fri 01/11 3:25 PM
Order to File Schedules A,B,D-H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individuals Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Ch 11 List of Equity Security Holders. (nbw) |
|
9 | 9
court
Entry
Fri 01/11 2:47 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Innovative Mattress Solutions, LLC Case No. 19-50042 Sleep Outfitters of Alabama LLC, Case No. 19-50043 Sleep Outfitters of Indiana LLC, Case No. 19-50044 Sleep Outfitters of Kentucky, LLC, Case No. 19-50045 Sleep Outfitters of Ohio LLC, Case No. 19-50046 Sleep Outfitters of Tennessee LLC, Case No. 19-50047 Sleep Outfitters of West Virginia, LLC, Case No. 19-50048 Sleep Liquidators LLC, Case No. 19-50049 Brown Immobilien LLC, Case No. 19-50050 Knopf Systems, LLC, Case No. 19-50051 and K.B. & Associates, Incorporated, Case No. 19-50052 Hereinafter, the docket for Case No. 19-50042 should be consulted for all matters affecting these Debtors and cases. (nbw) |
|
8 | 8
order
Operating Order
Fri 01/11 2:09 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (nbw) |
|
7 | 7
order
Generic
Fri 01/11 1:21 PM
Order designating individual responsible to perform duties of the debtors . (nbw) |
|
6 | 6
order
Joint Administration
Fri 01/11 12:57 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Joint Administration (nbw) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 01/11 9:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew D. Ellison Filed by on behalf of United Bank, a Virginia banking corporation. (Ellison, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Joint Administration
Fri 01/11 9:44 AM
Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases, filed by Brown Immobilien LLC. (DelCotto, Laura Day) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 01/11 9:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John L. Daugherty Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Daugherty, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 01/11 8:55 AM
Corporate Resolution, filed by Brown Immobilien LLC. (DelCotto, Laura Day) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 01/11 8:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1717 Filed by Brown Immobilien LLC. (DelCotto, Laura Day) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 01/11 9:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-50050 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 9673316, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |