Mundt v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Landya B Mccafferty |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 10, 2019 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Atrium Medical Corporation
64 Wentworth Drive
Husdon, NH 03051 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Getinge AB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbra Ann Mundt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Withdrawal
Wed 08/14 1:07 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Enjolique D. Aytch on behalf of All Defendants(Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extend Time
Thu 04/18 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Deadlines in CMO 3H filed by All Plaintiffs. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 05/22 4:04 PM
Document 1095 in 16-md-2753-LM terminated as was incorrectly spread by parties. See Document 1096 in 16-md-2753-LM. (de) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Tue 03/05 11:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re: 2 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/05 11:25 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (de) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 01/28 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants by Debbra Ann Mundt(Orent, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Mon 01/14 9:21 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (bt) |
||
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Fri 01/11 2:59 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1757134 filed by Debbra Ann Mundt.(Orent, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
MDL 2753 Case Assigned
Mon 01/14 9:20 AM
MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-45-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) |