USA v. Laws et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Case #: | 2:19-cr-00006 |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 11, 2019 11:42 PM PST |
Defendant
Denison Ellis (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron Laws (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Mayfield (3)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/12/2019 12:19 AM PST |
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to Aaron Laws (1), Denison Ellis (2), Jeffrey Mayfield (3). (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
Case unsealed as to Aaron Laws, Denison Ellis, Jeffrey Mayfield (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | ||
Arrest on 12/19/2018 of Aaron Laws in Northern District of Georgia. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | ||
Arrest on 12/19/2018 of Jeffrey Mayfield in Northern District of Georgia. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | ||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from Northern District of Georgia as to Jeffrey Mayfield(EN) (EN). [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Att: 1 Minute Order, Appointment of Counsel, Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings, Appearance Bond, Conditions of Release | ||
Att: 2 (12/26/2018) Financial Affidavit | ||
6 | 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to Jeffrey Mayfield. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
9 | 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to Aaron Laws. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
Arrest on 12/27/2018 of Denison Ellis in Northern District of Georgia. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | ||
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from Northern District of Georgia as to Denison Ellis(EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Att: 1 Minutes, | ||
Att: 2 Rule 5 Waiver, | ||
Att: 3 Appearance Bond, | ||
Att: 4 Conditions of Release | ||
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from Northern District of Georgia as to Aaron Laws(EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Att: 1 Initial Appearance Minutes, | ||
Att: 2 Temporary Detention Order, | ||
Att: 3 Detention Hearing Minutes, | ||
Att: 4 Commitment to Another District, | ||
Att: 5 Waiver of Rule 5 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Jeffrey Mayfield (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) At counsel request and no objection from the Government, Initial Appearance reset for 1/22/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (AE) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory Geist appearing for Jeffrey Mayfield (Geist, Gregory) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(AQ) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment | ||
16 | 16 CJA 20 Appointment as to Denison Ellis (No.pdf image attached): Appointment of Attorney Peter A. Camiel for Denison Ellis Approved by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
17 | 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Brian A Tsuchida- CRD: E. Nero ; AUSA: Marie Dalton ; Def Cnsl: Peter Camiel ; PTS: Lorraine Bolle ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00pm ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING as to Denison Ellis held on 1/4/2019. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed, Counsel appointed. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Parties agree with Pretrial Services' recommendation of release. Court adopts recommendation. Defendant placed on bond with special conditions. Preliminary Examination set for 1/18/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
18 | 18 Appearance Bond Entered as to Denison Ellis (2) PR with conditions. (cc: PTS/USPO/USMO) (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
19 | 19 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Denison Ellis. (EN) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Stricken Preliminary Hearing on 1/18/2019; as to Denison Ellis. (KMP) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 DECLARATION by Denison Ellis re lost passport (Camiel, Peter) [2:18-mj-00571-BAT] | |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 INDICTMENT as to Aaron Laws (1) counts 1, 2-3, 4, 5-10, Denison Ellis (2) count 1, Jeffrey Mayfield (3) count 1. (AQ) | |
Att: 1 Status Sheets (3) | ||
23 | 23 SEALED Signature Page to22 Indictment as to Aaron Laws, Denison Ellis, Jeffrey Mayfield. (AQ) | |
24 | 24 ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Aaron Laws by Hon. James P. Donohue. cc: USMO; (AQ) | |
25 | 25 ORDER CONTINUING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Denison Ellis by Hon. James P. Donohue. cc: USMO; (AQ) | |
26 | 26 ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORARY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Jeffrey Mayfield by Hon. James P. Donohue. cc: USMO; (AQ) |