Rafael Arroyo, Jr. v. Edinger HQ, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2019 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Edinger HQ, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Sandra Lindoerfer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Arroyo, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 02/12 12:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr..(Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 01/29 2:10 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE42 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 75 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Settlement
Wed 01/29 3:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr..(Seabock, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Declaration
Wed 01/22 11:15 PM
DECLARATION of Rafael Arroyo, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr..(Seabock, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 6 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Declaration
Wed 01/22 11:07 PM
DECLARATION of Evens Louis filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr..(Seabock, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 6 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Declaration
Wed 01/22 11:00 PM
DECLARATION of Janis Kent filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr..(Seabock, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 7 | ||
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Response
Mon 01/06 10:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,35 (Handy, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/23 12:15 PM
ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL HEARINGS by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation to Continue36 : Pursuant to joint stipulation of the pa1t ies, and finding good cause therefore, is hereby Ordered: The Court will continue trial in this matter to February 11, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. and the Final Pretrial Conference to February 3, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. (bm) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
stip
Continue
Fri 12/20 11:11 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Final Pretrial Hearings from January 14, 2020 to February 11, 2020 filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC.(Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 12/18 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge James V. Selna: On it own motion, the Court continues the pretrial conference to 8:30 a.m. January 6, 2020. The parties are ordered to show cause on January 6, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. why the Court should (a) not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Second Claim for Relief, violation of California Civil Code § 51(b), and (b) not strike the jury demand for want of a legal claim if the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction. The parties shall file a written response no later than noon January 3, 2020. (es) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
trial
Exhibit List
Fri 12/13 7:12 PM
JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr... (Seabock, Christopher) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Disclosure
Fri 12/13 3:19 PM
DISCLOSURE of of Pretrial filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC (Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Disclosure
Fri 12/13 10:23 AM
DISCLOSURE of Pretrial filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Seabock, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
trial
Witness List
Thu 12/12 4:00 PM
Witness List filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC.. (Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
30 | 30
7
pgs
trial
Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
Thu 12/12 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC. (Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
29 | 29
6
pgs
trial
Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
Thu 12/12 12:38 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Seabock, Christopher) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Witness List
Thu 12/12 12:38 PM
Witness List filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr... (Seabock, Christopher) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Appearance
Thu 12/12 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher A Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
attorney
Change of Address
Fri 09/06 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 07/16 10:45 AM
ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Mon 07/15 2:44 PM
MINUTES OF 1. Scheduling Conference 2. Order to Show Cause re Sanctions Against Plaintiff for Failure to Appear at the 6/24/19 Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Jury Trial January 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference January 2, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Within 7 days, Counsel shall meet and confer and submit a stipulation and proposed order with the balance of the case management dates as shown on Exhibit A to the Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference including the last date to conduct a settlement conference. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 07/08 10:33 AM
[IN CHAMB ERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: At the request of counsel for plaintiff, Scheduling Conference and Order to Show Cause previously set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 am are continued to 7/15/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response
Mon 07/01 4:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.to Scheduling Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,20 (Montgomery, Elliott) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Tue 06/25 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Sandra Lindoerfer has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/24 11:20 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing with counsel for the defendant, only, present. There is no appearance by or on behalf of plaintiff. The Court sets a Order to Show Cause on July 8, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall reply to the Order to Show Cause, in writing, by July 1, 2019. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es) |
|
19 | 19
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Mon 06/24 6:41 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Sandra Lindoerfer may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 04/30 4:26 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel16 , Notice of Association of Counsel,15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/29 4:14 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer. The Court directs the parties to conduct a settlement procedure of their choice and continues the Scheduling Conference to June 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es) |
|
16 | 16
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 04/29 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Andrew R Morand on behalf of Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC. Filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC (Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
15 | 15
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 04/29 12:37 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. Filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 04/11 4:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr... (Price, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 02/14 11:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC, identifying Edinger HQ LLC. (Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/14 11:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC.(Attorney Michelle McCoy Wolfe added to party Edinger HQ, LLC(pty:dft))(Wolfe, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 02/13 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only10 served on 02/12/2019. (Carson, Chris) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 02/08 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 4/29/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. The Court ORDERS counsel to file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with a completed Exhibit A, by 4/22/2019. (lb) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/25 4:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., upon Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Henry Cong in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 01/25 11:27 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/15 4:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Edinger HQ, LLC. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 01/15 4:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 01/15 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 01/15 1:19 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Carson, Chris) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 01/15 1:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., (Carson, Chris) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 01/15 1:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Carson, Chris) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/15 1:16 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23044082 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris) |