Stacy Fry, et al v. Napoleon Community Schools, et al
Original Case: 2:12-cv-15507
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-01137 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 25, 2017 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
NAPOLEON COMMUNITY SCHOOLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PAMELA BARNES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JACKSON COUNTY INTERMEDIATE SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STACY FRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRENT FRY, as next friend of minor E.F.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit over school banning service dog in class heads to federal court (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Tue 11/01/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 07/25/2017 3:29 AM CDT |