USA v. Munoz
Texas Western District Court | |
Case #: | 2:18-cr-02851 |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:38 AM CST |
Defendant
Jennifer Marie Munoz (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/18/2019 2:36 AM CST |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
Arrest of Jennifer Marie Munoz (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | ||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 11/19/2018 as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | ||
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | ||
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jennifer Marie Munoz (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jennifer Marie Munoz (1). By Judge Collis White. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
2 | 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
3 | 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Initial Appearance as to Jennifer Marie Munoz held on 11/21/2018 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 11/28/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Collis White, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jennifer Marie Munoz (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - MCIENEGA.) (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
4 | 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. Monica Elaine Guerrero for Jennifer Marie Munoz appointed. Signed by Judge Collis White. (sj) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
5 | 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jennifer Marie Munoz (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (mgc) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing by Jennifer Marie Munoz. (Guerrero, Monica) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
7 | 7 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Continue as to Jennifer Marie Munoz (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 12/6/2018 02:30 PM before Judge Collis White,. Signed by Judge Collis White. (mgc) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Jennifer Marie Munoz (mgc) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
9 | 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Jennifer Marie Munoz. Signed by Judge Collis White. (mgc) [2:18-mj-10935-CW] | |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 INDICTMEN filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jennifer Marie Munoz (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bb) |