UnderSea Recovery Corporation v. Madero Holding, S.A. de C.V.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00286 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2019 5:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Madero Holding, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Plaintiff
UnderSea Recovery Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
59 | 59
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 07/19 8:04 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit to Subpoena by UnderSea Recovery Corporation re58 Notice of Filing (English, Donald) |
|
58 | 58
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 07/19 7:58 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Subpoena Duces Tecum by UnderSea Recovery Corporation (English, Donald) |