Colorado District Court
Judge:R Brooke Jackson
Referred: Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:19-cv-00190
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2019 1:52 AM MST
Defendant
Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission
Represented By
Kyle William Davenport
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Eric R. Olson
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
William V. Allen
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
David Austin Beckstrom
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Jared S. Polis
Represented By
Kyle William Davenport
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Eric R. Olson
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
William V. Allen
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
David Austin Beckstrom
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Robbins
Represented By
Kyle William Davenport
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Eric R. Olson
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
William V. Allen
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
David Austin Beckstrom
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Defendant
State of Colorado
Represented By
Kyle William Davenport
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Eric R. Olson
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
William V. Allen
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
David Austin Beckstrom
Colorado Attorney General'S Office-Dept.Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Salazar
Colorado Rising For Communities
contact info
James Daniel Leftwich
Minddrive Legal Services LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
39 39 order Order on Motion to Clarify Wed 2:07 PM
ORDER granting38 Joint MOTION to Clarify Oral Order. This Court does not set the agenda for the Commission's hearings. The parties informed the Court that a hearing will be held in early to mid March. The Court hopes that the Commission will elect to consider what you call the "Comport" issue as well as the environmental, health and safety issues concerning the proposed drilling that appear to be the subject of this litigation. In the Court's view, the Commission should have an opportunity to address all those issues before a federal court determines whether and to what extent it can or should become involved. Ideally, the issues will be resolved in the state system, whether that be the Commission, the state courts, or the legislature. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/27/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
38 38 motion Clarify Tue 5:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Clarify Oral Order by Defendant Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission.(Davenport, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - February 12, 2019 Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Wildgrass Amended Complaint
37 37 misc Transcript Tue 9:26 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on February 12, 2019 before Judge Jackson. Pages: 1-20. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Transcript Tue 9:24 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on February 8, 2019 before Judge Jackson. Pages: 1-113. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
35 35 minutes Evidentiary Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11:58 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing, Day Two, held on 2/12/2019. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 4:37 PM
REPLY to Response to20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee.(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
33 33 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Mon 9:08 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re:27 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorneyEric R. Olson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
32 32 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 9:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance by James Daniel Leftwich on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney James Daniel Leftwich added to party Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee(pty:pla) (Leftwich, James)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 4:48 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2019, Motion Hearing continued to 2/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Fri 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Thursday, February 07, 2019
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 6:37 PM
RESPONSE to20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission, Jared S. Polis, Jeffrey Robbins, State of Colorado.(Davenport, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
28 28 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Austin Beckstrom on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David Austin Beckstrom added to party Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission(pty:dft), Attorney David Austin Beckstrom added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft), Attorney David Austin Beckstrom added to party Jeffrey Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney David Austin Beckstrom added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Beckstrom, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Jeffrey Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 5:59 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle William Davenport on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kyle William Davenport added to party Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle William Davenport added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle William Davenport added to party Jeffrey Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle William Davenport added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Davenport, Kyle)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William V. Allen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney William V. Allen added to party Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission(pty:dft), Attorney William V. Allen added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft), Attorney William V. Allen added to party Jeffrey Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney William V. Allen added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Allen, William)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Thu 12:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
23 23 order Minute Order Tue 1:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee,20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. A Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 2/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/29/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Summons Issued Tue 12:07 PM
SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dkals, )
Related: [-]
21 21 order Minute Order Tue 9:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee,20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. The Court requests that plaintiff's counsel contact Chambers at Jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov or (303) 844-4694 to schedule a hearing with notice to defendants. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/29/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
20 20 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 4:26 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee.(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Information for Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Memorandum In Support of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B
Friday, January 25, 2019
19 19 misc Summons Request Fri 10:52 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to State of Colorado by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Summons Request Fri 10:51 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jeffrey Robbins by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Summons Request Fri 10:51 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Summons Request Fri 10:50 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to State of Colorado re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 11:15 AM
ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/24/19. (rbjsec. )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Order Reassigning Case Wed 4:06 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/23/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00190-RBJ-NYW. (athom, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Administrative Notice Wed 3:57 PM
Administrative Notice re:9 ,10 ,11 ,12 Summons Request. Summons not issued a complete caption is not included on each summons request. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Summons Request Wed 2:20 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jeffrey Robbins re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Summons Request Wed 2:19 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Summons Request Wed 2:18 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to State of Colorado re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Summons Request Wed 2:17 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jared S. Polis re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. (Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 1:48 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b).ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 4/23/2019 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/23/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 12:52 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00190-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Wed 12:48 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 9:06 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summonses submitted are erroneous and will not be issued. Only one defendant may be named in a summons. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 8:58 AM
Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 8:46 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee.(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document Information for Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document Memo In Support of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B
2 2 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Wed 8:46 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Joseph Anthony Salazar . DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 8:40 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6495557)Attorney Joseph Anthony Salazar added to party Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee(pty:pla), filed by Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee.(Salazar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons