Sullivan v. HCA Healthcare, Inc. et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Julie A Robinson |
Referred: | James P O'Hara |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-02034 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2019 3:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Michelle Safford
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
|
|
Defendant
Menorah Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bradley McIlnay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susan Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Diana Rutherford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Herbert McCowen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Alan Keck, II
|
|
Defendant
HCA Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Gereau
mother of Michelle Safford 8218 N. Revere Court
Kansas City, MO 64151 |
|
Defendant
Family Health Medical Group of Overland Park, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott B. Sullivan
Pro Se Filing and Electronic Noticing 7214 W 71st Terrace
Overland Park, KS 66204 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
90 | 90
appeal
Mandate
Tue 03/23 3:36 PM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: AFFIRMING decision of the District Court (Appeal No. 19-3215 (ca) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter |