Petty v. First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy M Cain |
Referred: | Jacquelyn D Austin |
Case #: | 7:19-cv-00199 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 22, 2019 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jay Bland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill H Petty
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Brantlee Bennett
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
|
Defendant
Sharon Bryant
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
|
Defendant
Jimmy Gulledge
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
|
Defendant
Marie Howard
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/31 9:35 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Jill H Petty, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Jay Bland. (Summerlin, Jeremy) Modified on 3/31/2020: to add joint filers as listed (kmca ) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Fri 02/28 4:06 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company(Coyne, Edward) |
|
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/28 1:10 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 6/29/2020, Mediation Due by 4/1/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial on or after thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 3 of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/28/2020. (gpre, ) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 02/28 1:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/28/2020.(gpre, ) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 02/27 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Scheduling Order, by Jill H Petty. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
27 | 27
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Thu 02/27 11:21 AM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Jill H Petty(Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Mon 10/21 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Edward James Coyne, III for 11/08/2019-12/06/2019 (Coyne, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 to remove proposed order (gpre, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order
Wed 07/10 1:07 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 21 Consent Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/19.(kmca) |
|
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/10 12:59 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/28/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/30/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/30/2019, Discovery due by 3/2/2020, Mediation Due by 4/1/2020, Motions due by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/19. (kmca) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 07/10 9:55 AM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot 20 Joint Motion to amend/correct scheduling order. The Rule 26(f) Report allows for the amendment of the scheduling order without filing a motion. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/19.(kmca) |
|
22 | 22
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 07/10 9:49 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jill H Petty.(Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Confidentiality Order
Tue 07/09 4:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 07/09 4:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Scheduling Order,,, by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amended Conference and Scheduling Order | ||
19 | 19
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 07/09 4:16 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
18 | 18
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 07/09 4:15 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
17 | 17
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Tue 07/09 3:16 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Jill H Petty.(Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
8
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/04 7:20 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/25/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/9/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/9/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/29/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/30/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/30/2019, Discovery due by 12/2/2019, Motions due by 1/14/2020, Mediation Due by 1/2/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order,unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/4/2019. (gpre, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/29 1:04 PM
Text ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/29/2019.(kric, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Tue 05/28 5:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devon Diane Williams ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8469201) by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 6/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Admission of Devon Diane Williams, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Devon Diane Williams, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order regarding Devon Diane Williams's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Tue 05/28 5:37 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Regan Sayre ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8469168) by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 6/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Admission of Jeremy Regan Sayre, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Jeremy Regan Sayre, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order regarding Jeremy Regan Sayre's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission | ||
12 | 12
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/28 5:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
11 | 11
17
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 05/28 5:25 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company.(Coyne, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/02 3:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Jill H Petty. Jay Bland waiver executed on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company waiver executed on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/29 4:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company6 Amended Complaint. (gpre, ) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
14
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/28 9:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jay Bland, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, filed by Jill H Petty. Service due by 6/26/2019 (Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/28 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Randall Summerlin on behalf of Jill H Petty (Summerlin, Jeremy) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/24 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jtho, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 01/24 9:57 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jill H Petty.(jtho, ) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/24 9:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Brantlee Bennett, Jay Bland, Sharon Bryant, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Jimmy Gulledge, Marie Howard ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8227185.), filed by Jill H Petty. Service due by 4/23/2019(jtho, ) |