Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:19-cv-00057
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2019
Terminated:Mar 27, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2019 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
University of Richmond
Represented By
Stephanie Ploszay Karn
Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank Plc (richmond)
contact info
Robert Craig Wood
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Della J. Dumbaugh
Represented By
Scott Gregory Crowley
Crowley & Crowley
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/13/2020 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 27, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/27 12:55 PM
ORDER - The Court GRANTS the motion18 and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 03/27/2020. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
21 21 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 03/27 12:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 03/27/2020. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
20 20 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 11/18 3:44 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Richmond. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
19 19 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Tue 11/12 9:43 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Della J. Dumbaugh. (Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
18 18 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 10/28 3:09 PM
Memorandum in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Richmond. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/28 3:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by University of Richmond. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/25 3:51 PM
ORDER - Having reviewed the Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to file its Response to the Amended Complaint no later than October 29, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 10/25/2019. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/24 2:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by University of Richmond.(Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/08 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against University of Richmond, filed by Della J. Dumbaugh.(Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 10/01 2:40 PM
ORDER - Having reviewed the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint no later than October 8, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 10/01/2019. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 09/30 2:59 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Della J. Dumbaugh.(Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/11 9:03 AM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the defendant's motion to dismiss. (Dk. No. 3.) For the reasons stated in the accompanying Opinion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court DISMISSES Count One WITH PREJUDICE. The Court DISMISSES Count Two WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint as to Count Two within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 09/10/2019. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 09/11 9:02 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 09/10/2019. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
9 9 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 03/15 1:53 PM
RESPONSE in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Richmond.(Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Friday, March 08, 2019
8 8 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Fri 03/08 9:49 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Della J. Dumbaugh. (Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/28 11:11 AM
ORDER - Having reviewed the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file her opposition no later than March 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its reply no later than March 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 02/28/2019. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/27 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Craig Wood on behalf of University of Richmond (Wood, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/27 11:41 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Della J. Dumbaugh.(Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 15, 2019
4 4 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 02/15 2:41 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Richmond. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/15 2:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by University of Richmond. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/24 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to University of Richmond. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/24 2:20 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6460573.), filed by Della J. Dumbaugh.(Crowley, Scott) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/24/2019) (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Proposed Summons)
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 01/24 2:50 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]