California Central District Court
Case #: 2:19-cv-00583
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2019
Terminated:Jan 25, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2019 1:00 AM PST
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.169.217.181
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Lincoln D Bandlow
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 25, 2019
6 6 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Fri 2:59 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:19-cv-151 AG (JDEx). (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 8:10 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 8:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 8:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 8:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 8:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23096766 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A