Atari Interactive, Inc. v. Hyperkin Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00608 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 24, 2019 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hyperkin Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atari Interactive, Inc.
Browne George Rosss, LLP 2121 Avenue of the Stars Suite 2800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
56 | 56
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 02/12 2:11 PM
ORDER TO JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE,55 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS SO ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. Having read and considered the foregoing stipulation, the Court hereby orders the dismissal, with prejudice, of any and all of Plaintiffs claims against DefendantHyperkin, Inc. Hyperkin Inc. terminated. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
55 | 55
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 02/10 10:25 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc..(Wesley, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |