|
GPO
May 29 2020
ORDER granting 52 Defendant's ex parte application to stay case until Defendant's motion to disqualify has been decided. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/29/2020. (jpp) (dlg).
|
|
GPO
Jan 04 2021
ORDER: (A) Denying Defendant's Motion (1) To Disqualify Named Plaintiffs as Class Representatives, (2) To Disqualify Plaintiffs' Attorneys as Class Counsel, and (3) For Stay of Action Pending Determination by Court; (B) Denying Plaintiffs' Rule 11 Motion for Sanctions; and (C) Lifting Stay (ECF Nos. 50, 51, 57). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/4/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Mar 04 2021
ORDER Granting 72 Joint Motion Stipulating to Considering Plaintiffs' Class Certification Filing Timely. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/4/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Mar 11 2021
ORDER (1) Granting 74 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Certification and (2) Amending Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Ex Parte Motion and extends the deadline for Defendant to oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by three (3) weeks to 4/22/2021. However, in the interest of fairness, the Court reciprocally will extend the time for Plaintiffs to file their reply by three (3) weeks, to 5/27/2021. To accommodate the Court's schedule and give it adequate time to prepare for the hearing, the Court RESETS the hearing on the Motion for Class Certification to 6/24/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/11/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Apr 19 2021
ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Withdraw Estevan Lucero as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs and Discharging April 13, 2021 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/19/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Sep 28 2021
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Sarah Butler, and (3) Overruling Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declarations of Colin B. Weir and J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. (ECF Nos. 70, 86, 88, 89). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/28/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Oct 04 2021
ORDER Setting Status Conference. The Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/6/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel for the parties are responsible for coordinating and initiating a JOINT call into chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/4/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Oct 18 2021
ORDER Granting 101 Joint Motion for Continuance of Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is continued from 10/21/2021 to 11/17/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The conference will be held by video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/18/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Nov 02 2021
ORDER Granting 103 Joint Motion to Excuse Appearance of Plaintiff Michael Testone at Mandatory Settlement Conference set for November 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/1/2021. (tcf)
|
|
GPO
Mar 10 2022
ORDER Denying Joint Motion For Order Modifying Scheduling Order 114. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/10/2022. (ddf).
|