Lopez v. Sony Interactive Entertainment, LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00507 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2019 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sony Interactive Entertainment, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Christina Lopez
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 19 2020
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-01732-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Wed 05/20 7:50 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/20/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Tue 05/19 8:40 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-01732-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/04 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christina Lopez (Altman, Keith) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 02/21 10:49 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/20 10:44 AM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/20/19.(haS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Wed 02/20 8:24 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/20 7:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christina Lopez.. (Altman, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 02/19 12:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/31 5:00 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/29 11:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/29 8:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Sony Interactive Entertainment, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13043049.). Filed byChristina Lopez, on behalf of herself and all other similarly situated.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet coversheet |