22
|
|
22
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/05 3:45 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/04 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adam Buxbaum (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 02/21 8:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/21/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/20 11:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/20/2019.(jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
18
|
|
18
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 02/20 9:28 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/20/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/20 8:44 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/20/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Certificate of Interested Entities by Adam Buxbaum (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Proposed Summons. (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 50, Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13053346.). Filed byAdam Buxbaum.(Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|