ROMINE v. DIEBALL
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00011 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2019 7:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
OFICER CLINT DIEBALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID AARON ROMINE
214 HIGHLAND DR
WINDER, GA 30680 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Thu 06/27 10:59 AM
ORDER denying9 Motion for Reconsideration re8 Judgment,7 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/27/2019. (ggs) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 06/25 10:16 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Judgment,7 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Filed by DAVID AARON ROMINE.(ggs) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Wed 06/12 11:40 AM
JUDGMENT (ggs) |
|
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 06/12 11:19 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/12/2019. (ggs) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/22 10:37 AM
RESPONSE filed by DAVID AARON ROMINE re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ggs) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 04/10 5:04 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting4 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/10/2019 (hmb) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stay
Fri 03/29 1:26 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by CLINT DIEBALL filed by VIRGINIA AIDAN MOSS.(MOSS, VIRGINIA) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 03/29 1:23 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CLINT DIEBALL filed by VIRGINIA AIDAN MOSS.(MOSS, VIRGINIA) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Incident Report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Order Setting Bail, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Indictment | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/06 12:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLINT DIEBALL. as to CLINT DIEBALL (SOWELL, GREGORY) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/31 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against CLINT DIEBALL Filing Fee $ 400, Manual Receipt Number 42057, filed by DAVID AARON ROMINE. (ggs) |