Waite et al v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis A Kaplan |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01091 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2019 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Does 1 though 10
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Ely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Waite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Israel Caballero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Straw Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Graves Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stan Sobol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kasim Sulton
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
UMG Recordings, Inc.
Terminated: 06/06/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
297 | 297
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/20 12:30 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Capitol Records, LLC, Does 1 though 10, UMG Recordings, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Susan Straw Harris, Earle R. Ely, Jr, Stan Sobol, Dennis Mehaffey, Leonard Graves Phillips, David Pellish. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Arnold, Roy) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
296 | 296
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 03/14 12:10 PM
ORDER granting295 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/14/24) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
295 | 295
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 03/13 7:05 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reactivate this Case, etc. addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Roy W. Arnold dated 03/13/24. Document filed by Susan Straw Harris, Dennis Mehaffey, David Pellish, Leonard Graves Phillips, Stan Sobol, Kasim Sulton, Steve Wynn..(Arnold, Roy) |