Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:19-cv-00264
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2019 4:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Carlson Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Steven J Sheridan
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Olivia Moe
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carlson Hotels Holding Inc.
701 Carlson Parkway
Minnetonka, MN 55345
Represented By
Steven J Sheridan
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Olivia Moe
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carlson Inc.
701 Carlson Parkway Ste 1500
Minnetonka, MN 55345
Represented By
Steven J Sheridan
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Olivia Moe
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Davidson Hotel Company
One Ravinia Drive Suite 1600
Atlanta, GA 30346
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Defendant
Davidson Hotels LLC
One Ravinia Drive Suite 1600
Atlanta, GA 30346
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Christopher R Morris
Bassford Remele
contact info
Defendant
Radisson Hospitality Inc.
701 Carlson Parkway Suite 1500
Minnetonka, MN 55345
Represented By
Steven J Sheridan
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Olivia Moe
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By
William D Hittler
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Defendant
Marc L. Messina
Defendant
WSI(I)-RWP, LLC
660 Steamboat Road
Greenwich, CT 06830
Represented By
Steven J Sheridan
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Olivia Moe
Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Corey Skelton
Represented By
Michael M Bader
Michael M. Bader, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2019 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 04, 2019
42 42 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
41 41 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 4:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Davidson Hotel Company served on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
40 40 service Affidavit of Service Mon 3:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Corey Skelton (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
39 39 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
38 38 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Radisson Hospitality Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
35 35 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Davidson Hotel Company served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Davidson Hotels LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Davidson Hotel Company served on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/22/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Davidson Hotel Company served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Return of Service Executed Mon 3:16 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Davidson Hotel Company on 02/01/2018, filed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Return of Service Executed Mon 3:14 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Davidson Hotel Company on 12/06/2018, filed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Return of Service Executed Mon 3:08 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Keith Wright on 12/06/2018, filed by Corey Skelton. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Carlson Holdings Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Carlson Hotels Holding Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Skelton. Carlson Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Bader, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
17 17 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 2:53 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Davidson Hotel Company. (Skemp, Brittany)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 2:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Davidson Hotel Company. (Skemp, Brittany)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 1:14 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aplite Holdings AB is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Radisson Hospitality Inc.. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 1:13 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Carlson Holding, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Carlson Inc.. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 1:12 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Radisson Hospitality, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Carlson Hotels Holding Inc.. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 1:08 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Carlson Holdings Inc.. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Morris on behalf of Davidson Hotels LLC. (Morris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Moe on behalf of Carlson Holdings Inc., Carlson Hotels Holding Inc., Carlson Inc., Radisson Hospitality Inc., WSI(I)-RWP, LLC. (Moe, Olivia)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 2:28 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant WSI(I)-RWP, LLC.(Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by WSI(I)-RWP, LLC. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Carlson Holdings Inc., Carlson Hotels Holding Inc., Carlson Inc., Radisson Hospitality Inc.. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Sheridan on behalf of Carlson Holdings Inc., Carlson Hotels Holding Inc., Carlson Inc., Radisson Hospitality Inc., WSI(I)-RWP, LLC. (Sheridan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 3:40 PM
ORDER of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-264 (MJD/DTS) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/13/2019 and Eric C. Tostrud on 2/19/2019. (MMP) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (MMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
4 4 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 10:48 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Hittler, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Hittler, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 9:13 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-264 ECT/ECW. (JLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6650580) filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Hittler, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Letter, Summons, Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Dakota County,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service