CARDINE v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Harvey Bartle, III |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-20062 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2019 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
MCKESSON CORP
|
|
Defendant
MERCK & CO INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEE CARDINE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 10 2019
MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/10/2019. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/23 7:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MERCK & CO INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (SANGIAMO, DINO) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/03 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/27 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA J. HUMPHREY on behalf of LEE CARDINE (HUMPHREY, DEBRA) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pretrial Order
Tue 02/12 12:40 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 86 THAT MERCK'S RESPONSIVE MOTION(S), PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE(S) THERETO, MERCK'S REPLY AND BRIEFS AND THE ASSOCIATED ORDERS IN DALE ANDERSON V. MERCK & CO., INC. SHALL APPLY TO ALL CASES IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBIT NO. 1. THIS ORDER SHALL BE DOCKETED IN THE 93 CASES IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBIT NO. 1. THE COURT'S RULING ON MERCK'S RESPONSIVE MOTIONS IN DALE ANDERSON V. MERCK & CO. INC. SHALL BE DOCKETED IN ALL CASES IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBIT NO. 1.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/8/2019. 2/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 160 IN 18-MD-2848) (kp, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 02/06 11:34 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-15868. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-15) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA.(dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER denying3 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/10/2019. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
6 | 6 5 pgs MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/10/2019. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 LETTER ORDER granting a 30 day extension of time within which Merck, may answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaints in each of the actions listed in Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/20/2018.(jjc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Letter from Merck & Co., Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. regarding briefing schedule re3 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants . (HOLLOWS, ALLISON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
Set Deadlines as to the3 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | ||
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants by LEE CARDINE.(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (HOLLOWS, ALLISON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID L 5942 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9159083), filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(HOLLOWS, ALLISON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kas, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/6/2019.] |