Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc Thomas Treadwell
Case #: 5:19-cv-00039
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Feb 07, 2019 5:05 PM EST
Defendant
HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER, LLC
Plaintiff
QAISAR KHAN
Represented By
JOHN ANTHONY MOORE
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Friday, March 01, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 3:30 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time For Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER LLC (ROSEN, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by QAISAR KHAN as to HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER LLC. (MOORE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
3 3 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Fri 10:41 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to QAISAR KHAN (ans)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10:41 AM
Summons Issued as to HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER LLC. (ans)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
1 1 misc Complaint Thu 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3081151, $400 filed by QAISAR KHAN(MOORE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons