Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James G Carr
Case #: 3:19-cv-00295
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2019 4:46 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae
City of Oregon, Ohio
Department of Law 5330 Seaman Road
Oregon, OH 43616
Represented By
Melissa M. Purpura
City Of Oregon
contact info
Amicus Curiae
City of Toledo
One Government Center Department of Law Ste. 2250
Toledo, OH 43604
Represented By
Karlene D. Henderson
City Of Toledo - One Government Center
contact info
Dale R. Emch
City Of Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Acting Regional Administrator of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5
Represented By
Daniel R. Dertke
U.S. Department Of Justice - Environment & Natural Resources
contact info
Defendant
Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By
Daniel R. Dertke
U.S. Department Of Justice - Environment & Natural Resources
contact info
Defendant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By
Daniel R. Dertke
U.S. Department Of Justice - Environment & Natural Resources
contact info
Defendant
Regional Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5
Represented By
Daniel R. Dertke
U.S. Department Of Justice - Environment & Natural Resources
contact info
Plaintiff
Environmental Law & Policy Center
Represented By
Howard A. Learner
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Alda W. Yuan
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Robert S. Michaels
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Jean-Luc Kreitner
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Michael R. Barsa
Northwestern Pritzker School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Lucas County Commissioners
Represented By
Fritz Byers
contact info
Plaintiff
Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie
Represented By
Howard A. Learner
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Madeline P. Fleisher
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Alda W. Yuan
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Robert S. Michaels
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Jean-Luc Kreitner
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Michael R. Barsa
Northwestern Pritzker School Of Law
contact info

GPO Nov 13 2019
Order U.S. EPA's motion to dismiss ELPC's complaint (Doc. 18) be, and the same hereby is, denied. U.S. EPA's motion to dismiss the Lucas County Board of Commissioner's complaint (Doc. 26) be, and the same hereby is, denied as to count one and held in abeyance as to count two. The clerk of court shall forthwith set this case for a further status/scheduling conference. Judge James G. Carr on 11/13/19.(C,D)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
35 35 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 2:00 PM
Motion for attorney Caroline Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9659501, filed by Plaintiff Environmental Law & Policy Center.(Michaels, Robert) Modified to correct receipt number on 12/4/2019 (M,L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Caroline Cox Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
order Minute Order _ Status Conference Wed 11/27 2:29 PM
Order [non-document] of Telephone Status Conference held on 11/26/19 Time: 25 Minutes. Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Defendants to file the administrative record on or before December 20, 2019. Defendants' answer due on or before December 30, 2019. Further telephonic status/scheduling conference set for January 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The call will take place on the court's conference line (877-336-1839, access code 8856866). Parties to file status report(s), including a proposed timetable for further proceedings, on or before January 14, 2020. Judge James G. Carr on 11/26/19. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 11/22 11:45 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice of Status Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr using the court's conference line as provided via email. Related document(s)34 . (C,D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
34 34 31 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Order on Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Wed 11/13 12:52 PM
Order U.S. EPA's motion to dismiss ELPC's complaint (Doc.18 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied. U.S. EPA's motion to dismiss the Lucas County Board of Commissioner's complaint (Doc.26 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied as to count one and held in abeyance as to count two. The clerk of court shall forthwith set this case for a further status/scheduling conference. Judge James G. Carr on 11/13/19.(C,D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
33 33 transc Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter Tue 10/22 10:08 AM
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 24, 2019 before Judge James G. Carr. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Angela Nixon at (419) 260-5259. [135 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 10/29/2019. Redaction Request due 11/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (N,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
32 32 resp Response Fri 10/11 6:27 PM
Response to26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Supplemental Memorandum Opposing Motions to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Michaels, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
order Order Tue 10/08 12:00 PM
Order. [non-document] Upon request, the post-hearing briefing deadline is extended to 10/11/19 by 6:00 PM(EDT). Judge James G. Carr on 10/8/19. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
31 31 oth_doc Transcript Request (non-appeal) Wed 09/25 11:02 AM
Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 9/24/19 before Judge Carr, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: 10/2/19 filed by All Defendants. (Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
30 30 resp Reply Wed 09/18 3:35 PM
Reply in support of26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Regional Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Leave Wed 09/18 11:41 AM
Motion for leave to file out of time Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Regional Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00295-JGC, 3:19-cv-00873-JGC (Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Sept 16 email regarding ECF problem),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (reply brief)
order Order Wed 09/18 10:34 AM
Order: [non-document] It appearing that U.S. EPA did not file a reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss the complaint of the Lucas County Board of Commissioners by the court-ordered deadline of September 16, 2019 (Doc. 22), it is hereby ORDERED THAT U.S. EPA shall file a reply brief addressing only count two of the County Commissioners' complaint on or before 12:00 p.m. EDT on September 20, 2019. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 9/18/19. (C,D)
Related: [-] 22
order Order on Motion for leave Wed 09/18 12:43 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for leave to file Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 9/18/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 29
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
28 28 resp Opposition Tue 09/03 1:58 PM
Opposition to26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Board of Lucas County Commissioners. (Byers, Fritz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 08/21 3:06 PM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Evidentiary Hearing previously set for 9/23/19 has been RESET for 9/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 204 before Judge James G. Carr. Related [+]. (C,D)
Related: [-] 26 ,22 ,18
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
27 27 resp Reply Wed 08/14 6:54 PM
Reply in support of18 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 07/31 6:59 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Regional Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Related document(s)(1 in 3:19-cv-00873-JGC, 1 in 3:19-cv-00873-JGC).Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00295-JGC, 3:19-cv-00873-JGC(Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (2006 Assessment Guidance),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (2018 Integrated Report)
Friday, July 26, 2019
25 25 oth_ans Brief Fri 07/26 11:48 AM
Joint Memorandum of Amicus Curia in Support of Plaintiff filed by City of Oregon, Ohio, City of Toledo. (Henderson, Karlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of E. Moore,
Att: 2 Affidavit of D. Wagner
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
order Order on Motion for leave Wed 07/24 11:28 AM
Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion of City of Toledo and City of Oregon for leave to file Amicus Curiae in support of Plaintiff Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 7/24/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
24 24 resp Response Wed 07/10 6:31 PM
Response to18 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law & Policy Center.(Michaels, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Nutrient Mass Balance Study 2018,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Excerpts from Ohio 2018 IR,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter to Tiffani Kavalec OEPA - 2018 IR approval
Friday, June 21, 2019
23 23 notice Notice Fri 06/21 10:13 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Environmental Law & Policy Center. (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Minute Order _ Status Conference Fri 06/21 3:19 PM
Order of Status Conference held on 6/20/19. Time: 45 minutes. Upon joint oral motion of all parties in both cases, the above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Case 3:19cv295 shall be deemed the lead case. All further filings shall be filed in the lead case 3:19cv295 only. In lead case 3:19cv295 Plaintiffs' response to pending motion to dismiss (Doc. 18 ) due 7/10/19, reply due 8/14/19. Dispositive Motions (in former case 3:19cv873 due by 7/31/2019, Opposition due 9/3/2019, Replies due by 9/16/2019. Oral Arguments Hearing set for 9/23/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 204 before Judge James G. Carr. Judge James G. Carr on 6/21/19. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00295-JGC, 3:19-cv-00873-JGC(C,D)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 06/21 2:33 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Howard A. Learner for Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, and Environmental Law & Policy Center. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 6/21/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 19
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 06/21 2:37 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert S. Michaels for Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie and for Environmental Law & Policy Center. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 6/21/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 20
utility Create Case Relationship Fri 06/21 3:02 PM
Related Cases: Create association to 3:19-cv-00873-JGC. (C,D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
21 21 motion Leave Thu 06/20 2:18 PM
Joint Motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff filed by City of Toledo, City of Oregon, Ohio.(Henderson, Karlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A Affidavit of E. Moore,
Att: 2 Affidavit Exhibit B Affidavit of D. Wagner
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/19 11:32 AM
Motion for attorney Robert S. Michaels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9372527, filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law & Policy Center.(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Robert S. Michaels PHV
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/19 11:05 AM
Motion for attorney Howard A. Learner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9372319, filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law & Policy Center.(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Howard A. Learner PHV
Thursday, June 13, 2019
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Thu 06/13 9:18 AM
Notice [non-document] Initial Status Conference RESET for 6/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of conference. Related document(s)1 . (C,EA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 05/20 4:42 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Acting Regional Administrator of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Related document(s)1 .(Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - excerpts of 2006 Assessment Guidance,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - excerpts of Ohio 2016 IR Amended,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - excerpts of Ohio 2018 IR
Friday, May 17, 2019
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 05/17 2:58 PM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel R. Dertke filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Dertke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 05/17 3:37 PM
Notice [non-document] of Initial Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of conference. Related document(s)1 . (C,EA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 04/05 12:25 PM
Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alda W. Yuan for Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie,Alda W. Yuan for Environmental Law & Policy Center. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 4/5/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 3
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 04/05 12:37 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jean-Luc Kreitner for Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, and Environmental Law & Policy Center. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 4/5/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 03/27 4:44 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael R. Barsa for Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie and Environmental Law & Policy Center. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 3/27/19.(C,D)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 5:48 PM
Motion for attorney Michael Barsa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9197555, filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law & Policy Center.(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michael Barsa for Admission PHV,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Michael Barsa PHV
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
15 15 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 03/06 10:41 AM
Affidavit of Service by personal service by a process server executed upon U.S. Defendants through U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio on 2/21/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleisher, Madeline) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (M,L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
14 14 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 02/27 2:48 PM
Return of Service by personal service by a process server executed upon U.S. EPA Acting Administrator, Andrew Wheeler on 02/19/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 02/27 2:45 PM
Return of Service by personal service by a process server executed upon U.S. EPA on 02/19/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 02/27 2:14 PM
Return of Service by personal service by a process server executed upon U.S. EPA Regional Administrator, Region 5, Cathy Stepp on 02/14/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 02/27 2:10 PM
Return of Service by personal service by a process server executed upon U.S. Attorney General, Matthew Whitaker on 02/19/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
10 10 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 02/14 10:54 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General for Acting Regional Administrator of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
9 9 oth_doc Praecipe Wed 02/13 12:08 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs.(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons U.S. Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker,
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Attorney David A. Sierleja
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
8 8 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 02/12 2:45 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Acting Regional Administrator of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5; Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency; United States Environmental Protection Agency. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
7 7 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 02/11 4:07 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs.(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons U.S. EPA Acting Administrator,
Att: 2 Summons U.S. EPA,
Att: 3 Summons U.S. EPA Regional Administrator, Region 5
6 6 1 pgs order Order reassigning case Mon 02/11 2:39 PM
Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge James G. Carr for all further proceedings, as related to 3:17cv1514 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/11/2019. (S,AL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 02/11 3:00 PM
Judge James G. Carr assigned to case, Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick terminated. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
5 5 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 02/08 9:43 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 02/08 8:45 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 02/08 8:46 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Fri 02/08 9:52 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/07 4:51 PM
Motion for attorney Jean-Luc Kreitner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9137692, filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law and Policy Center. Related document(s)1 .(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Jean-Luc Kreitner PHV
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/07 4:46 PM
Motion for attorney Alda Yuan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9137669, filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law and Policy Center. Related document(s)1 .(Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Alda Yuan PHV
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/07 4:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie, Environmental Law and Policy Center. (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/07 4:23 PM
Complaint against Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Regional Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9137470. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 3:17-cv-01514 . Filed by Environmental Law and Policy Center, Advocates for a Clean Lake Erie. (Fleisher, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet ELPC and ACLE,
Att: 2 Summons U.S. EPA,
Att: 3 Summons U.S. EPA Administrator Andrew Wheeler,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. EPA Acting Regional Administrator Cathy Stepp, Region 5,
Att: 5 Summons U.S. Attorney David A. Sierleja,
Att: 6 Summons U.S. Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2018 Integrated Report Approval