Martinez v. 3M Company et al DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-00298 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2019 3:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aearo Technologies, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Layla Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of MDL Case Transferred Out
Tue 04/23 11:17 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (JAT) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Certified Copy of MDL (JPML) Panel Order
Fri 04/19 2:32 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00214-JRT-KMM et al.(MMP) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Staying Case
Fri 03/01 12:21 PM
(Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendants obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/1/2019. (KAT) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 02/28 3:07 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/28 3:07 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Layla Martinez. (Hulse, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 02/25 4:26 PM
ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-298 (JRT/KMM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Judge David S. Doty and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/21/2019, by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 2/22/2019, and by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/25/2019. (lmb) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/14 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Layla Martinez. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/14 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Layla Martinez. 3M Company served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/08 8:43 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMP) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 02/08 8:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-298 (PAM/TNL). (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/07 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6658268) filed by Layla Martinez. Filer requests summons issued. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |