SCUDDER v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00137 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2019 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
IBRAHIM AFFANEH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT CAMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RAJENDAR GARG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND
|
Represented By
|
Evaluator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRION A. SCUDDER
285 Olive Street
Inidana, PA 15701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
49 | 49
order
Order
Fri 02/05 3:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING48 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND, ROBERT CAMP. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/5/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) |
|
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty)
Fri 02/05 2:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Simkin, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order
Tue 08/11 11:51 AM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CASE CLOSING. The court has been advised by counsel for the Plaintiff that the above captioned action has been settled and that the only matters remaining are the execution of the settlement document and the compliance of the terms set out in the settlement agreement. It appears that there is no further action required by the Court at this time. It is, accordingly, hereby ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above captioned case closed; that nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate the same in the identical manner as if this order had not been entered. FURTHER, the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/11/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Wed 06/03 2:37 PM
ORDER granting45 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint within seven days, on or before 6/10/2020. Defendants shall file their Answer within fourteen days thereafter, on or before 6/24/2020. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/3/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Amend
Mon 06/01 6:24 PM
Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order
Tue 05/05 3:26 PM
ORDER. In light of the parties' joint Notice (Doc.43 ), the Court shall extend the stay until 7/13/2020. On or before that date, the parties shall file a new joint status report notifying the Court of any mediation efforts in which they have engaged, whether the stay will need to be extended further, and whether any party intends to file a motion for summary judgment. The joint report should take into account the impact of COVID-19 and inform the Court of the parties' efforts to use technology to overcome any barriers to progress caused by the pandemic. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/5/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Mon 05/04 3:08 PM
NOTICE by BRION A. SCUDDER (Casey, Sean) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/01 9:30 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for discovery is extended until 6/12/2020. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/1/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 04/20 2:47 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order
Wed 04/08 3:46 PM
ORDER. On or before Wednesday, April 15, 2020, Plaintiff must serve Defendants with a settlement demand representing a meaningful and best effort to settle this case. On or before April 23, 2020, Defendants' counsel must confer with Defendants regarding the settlement demand made by Plaintiff. On or before April 27, 2020, counsel for the parties must meet and confer either telephonically or by video regarding the settlement demand and any counter-offer or acceptance. Additional telephonic or video negotiations, if necessary, are encouraged, however, the parties must provide the Court with a joint notice of the outcome of these negotiations (exclusive of the settlement amount), including a recitation of the dates by which the parties completed each of the directives herein, no later than May 4, 2020. If a case has not settled as a result of this process, the parties are directed to include in their joint notice whether any party intends to file a motion for summary judgment. A motion for an extension of these deadlines will be granted only for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/8/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm)
Thu 03/19 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Sarah J. Simkin on behalf of IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. Attorney Yana L. Warshafsky terminated. (Simkin, Sarah) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
order
~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Order Staying Case Order for Statistical Case Closing
Mon 03/16 6:39 PM
The parties' Motion37 to extend is GRANTED, and discovery is extended until 4/30/20, consistent with the following: ORDER. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and consistent with the "substance and tenor" of the Order of general applicability issued by the Honorable Judge Mark R. Hornak at Misc. No. 2:20-mc-394 on 3/13/20, the Court hereby STAYS and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES this case. Administrative closings are a familiar way in which courts remove cases from their active files without final adjudication. Administrative closure is a docket control device used by the Court for statistical purposes, and it does not prejudice the rights of the parties in any manner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Conference scheduled for 4/1/20 at 2:15 p.m. is POSTPONED until further order of Court. Once the Court resumes normal operations, and restrictions necessitated by the virus has have lapsed, the Court will REOPEN this case and reschedule all previously scheduled proceedings. Nothing in this Order shall affect the parties responsibilities to respond to motions or any directives of the Court, nor shall anything in this Order preclude the exchange of discovery information, assuming those events can be carried out safely and in accordance with prudent health practices. Extensions of time to perform certain tasks will be granted liberally, particularly if such extensions are due in any way to illness or practical considerations caused by the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/16/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 03/16 3:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Warshafsky, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
utility
~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 02/27 6:23 AM
Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/19/20 RESCHEDULED to 4/1/2020 02:15 PM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. (jhi) |
||
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
minutes
Telephonic Status Conference
Thu 02/27 6:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/26/2020. (Court Reporter: None) (jhi) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
ORDER re31 Motion for Telephone Conference. Consistent with the telephone conference today, discovery shall conclude on 3/31/2020. The Court does not anticipate granting any additional extensions of the discovery period. The status/settlement conference currently scheduled for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for 4/1/2020 at 2:15 p.m. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/26/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 02/20 7:11 AM
AMENDED ORDER, Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 02:15 PM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Counsel is directed to contact chambers at 412-208-7460 on a single telephone line to initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 02/20 7:07 AM
ORDER, Telephonic Status Conference is now set for 2/26/2002 at 02:15 PM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Counsel is directed to contact chambers on a single phone line at 412-208-7460 to initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/20 7:05 AM
ORDER granting31 Joint MOTION for Telephone Conference. Order setting conference to follow. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/20/20. (jhi) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
Wed 02/19 2:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Telephone Conference with the Court by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Warshafsky, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/15 2:01 PM
ORDER, Post Discovery Status/Settlement Conference set for 3/11/20 is now RESCHEDULED to 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/15/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 12/16 11:15 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery in this case shall be extended for a period of 60 days, yielding a new closing date of 2/26/2020. The Post-Discovery Status Conference scheduled for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. is re-scheduled to 3/11/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/16/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 12/13 11:10 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
adr
Report of Mediation
Fri 11/15 11:10 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 11/14/2019. (Cimini, Sally) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm)
Tue 09/10 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Yana L. Warshafsky on behalf of IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. Attorney Michael E. Kennedy terminated. (Warshafsky, Yana) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation
Fri 09/06 1:58 PM
Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Early Neutral Evaluation Date 10/23/2019 10:00 am (Cimini, Sally) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation
Wed 07/31 11:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Sally Griffith Cimini is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Party SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI added. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) |
|
23 | 23
order
Case Management Order
Wed 07/31 11:40 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See contents of this filing for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/19. (rdl) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Case Management Conference
Wed 07/31 11:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Case Management Conference held on 7/31/2019. (Court Reporter: None) Order to follow. (jhi) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Fri 07/26 12:15 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 07/26 12:14 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/26 2:22 PM
ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/26/19. |
|
Att: 1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/26 2:15 PM
ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/26/19. (jhi) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 06/26 1:16 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/18 5:28 PM
ORDER granting15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 6/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/18/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/18 4:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/05 5:18 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants, filed by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 05/29 10:35 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before June 5, 2019. Defendants shall file their Answer or other responsive pleading within fourteen days of the date on which Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is filed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 05/28 1:43 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 6:09 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ROBERT CAMP, RAJENDAR GARG, IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ Answer due from All Defendants. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 4:10 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRION A. SCUDDER. IBRAHIM AFFANEH served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Casey, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 4:09 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRION A. SCUDDER. PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Casey, Sean) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 4:08 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRION A. SCUDDER. ROBERT CAMP served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Casey, Sean) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 4:06 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRION A. SCUDDER. RAJENDAR GARG served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Tue 04/02 1:42 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/02 12:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/02 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Kennedy on behalf of IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/21 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Alan Casey on behalf of BRION A. SCUDDER. (Casey, Sean) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/08 7:01 AM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/8/19. (jhi) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Thu 02/07 6:03 PM
COMPLAINT against IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668054576), filed by BRION A. SCUDDER. (ksa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt for filing fee | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/07 6:05 PM
Summons Issued as to IBRAHIM AFFANEH, PRASHANTH BHARADWAJ, ROBERT CAMP, MICHAEL A. DRISCOLL, RAJENDAR GARG, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY S. MOERLAND. (ksa) |