|
GPO
Jun 24 2019
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 6/24/2019 Re: Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 345(b) Waiving Requirements of 11 U.S.C. § 345(b) with Respect to Certain Debtor Bank Accounts. (related document(s)598) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 19 2019
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/19/2019 Re: Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of a Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release Among Debtors and Bank of America, N.A. (related document(s)701) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 28 2019
Memorandum Decision signed on 8/28/2019 on Confirmation of the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. (related document(s)1032) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 03 2020
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/3/2020 on the Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claims with respect to the Claims of Viatcheslav Strekalov and Elena Evglevskaya (Claim Nos. 156 and 2627) (related document(s)1764) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 03 2020
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/3/2020 on the Seventeenth and Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Objections to Proofs of Claims with respect to the Claims of Michele and Thomas Sturman. (Claim Nos. 2448, 2551, and 2685) (related document(s)1758, 1749) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 11 2020
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/9/2020 Re: Omnibus Objs with respect to the Claims of Sophia Elaine Demontegnac and Desmond Roy Demontegnac. (related document(s)1666, 1743) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Nov 30 2020
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 11/30/2020 Granting Plan Administrator's Sixth Omnibus Motion to Enforce the Plan Injunction and Confirmation Order as it relates to Gautam and Panthobi Sharma. (related document(s)2656) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jan 03 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 1/2/2020 Denying Reorganized RMS's Second Omnibus Motion to Enforce Injunctive Provisions of Plan and Confirmation Order against Dr. Elie Nassar. (related document(s)2086) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jan 21 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 1/20/2021 Sustaining the Eleventh Omnibus Objection and Twenty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Proof of Claims (no basis consumer creditor claims) against Michael J. Donahue. (related document(s)1760, 1743) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Feb 02 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 2/2/2021 Sustaining the Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Proof of Claims (No Basis Consumer Creditor Litigation Claims) against Darryl Keith Browder. (related document(s)1764) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Feb 09 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 2/8/2021 Sustaining the Ninth Omnibus Objection (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to claim of James Beekman. (related document(s)1741) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 12 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/12/2021 Sustaining the Forty-Third Omnibus Objection (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Claims of Sonya Davis. (related document(s)1976) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 12 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/12/2021 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Claim of Dessie Brumfield. (related document(s)3227) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 14 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/13/2021 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to claim of Myron Hale. (related document(s)2837) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 14 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/13/2021 Sustaining the Fourteenth Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to Claim of Paul Malloy. (related document(s)1746) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 21 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/21/2021 Sustaining The Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to Claim of Kenneth Ellison and Angela Ellison. (related document(s)3121) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 30 2021
Errata Order signed on 5/27/2021 Re: Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/21/2021 Sustaining The Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to Claim of Kenneth Ellison and Angela Ellison. (related document(s)3400) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 6/1/2021 Denying the Motion for Rehearing. (related document(s)3261, 3305) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jun 29 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 6/25/2021 Sustaining the Sixty-Seventh Omnibus objection (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Claim of Burton Dezihan. (related document(s)3121) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jun 30 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 6/29/2021 Denying Claimant James Beekman's Request for Leave to Amend. (related document(s)3361) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 08 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/6/2021 Sustaining Forty-Eighth Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Litigation Claims) with Respect to Claim of Lucille Wills and Edward Bailey. (related document(s)2148) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 05 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/4/2021 Sustaining The Forty-Sixth Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims)with respect to claims of Alethia Hankins. (related document(s)2145) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 05 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/4/2021 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Documentation and Untimely Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to claim of Terrence L. Grundy. (related document(s)2320) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 06 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/4/2021 Sustaining Ninth Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to Claim of Radmila Baricak. (related document(s)1741) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 20 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/20/2021 Granting the Joint Motion of Plan Administrator and Consumer Representative. (related document(s)3529) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 03 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/1/2021 Sustaining the Fifteenth Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Claim of Alton W. Obert. (related document(s)1747) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 04 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/4/2021 Denying the Renewed Motions for Rehearing and for Leave to Amend. (related document(s)3528, 3533) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 21 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/21/2021 Sustaining Fifty-Second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Misclassified Claims) with respect to Claims of Liberty Home Equity Solutions, Inc. and Finance of America Reverse LLC. (related document(s)2186) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 27 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/26/2021 Sustaining the Fourteenth Omnibus Objection (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Claim of Sonia Lowe. (related document(s)1746) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Dec 03 2021
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 12/3/2021 Sustaining The Thirty-Second Omnibus Claims Objection to Proofs of Claim with Respect to the Claim of Cynthia Settles (Claim No. 511) (No Basis Consumer Creditor Litigation Claims) (related document(s)1764) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 28 2022
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/28/2022 Sustaining the Sixty-Third and Fiftieth Omnibus Objections with Respect to the Claims of Roy J. Dixon Jr. (Claim Nos. 2896 and 2906) and Denying the various related Motions filed by Roy J. Dixon Jr. (related document(s)3810, 3737, 3563, 2840) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/26/2022 Sustaining the Trustee and Plan Administrator's Objection to the Walters Claim and the Additiional Claims and Disallowing and Expunging the Claims. (related document(s)2324) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Nov 15 2022
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 11/14/2022 Denying The Motion for Relief from the Plan Injunction filed by Jamil George Rabadi. (related document(s)3839) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2022
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 12/22/2022 Sustaining the Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) against Michael J. Kelsey. (related document(s)1976) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Feb 07 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 2/7/2023 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) against Jared Freedman. (related document(s)2837) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 3/31/2023 Denying Hilda Hutchinson's Motion for stay Pending Appeal. (related document(s)4646, 4647) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 04 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/4/2023 Re: Omnibus Objections to the Claims of Lisa Janco. (related document(s)3737, 1760, 3995) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 24 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/24/2023: (I) Authorizing the Wind Down Estates to (A) Abandon and Dispose of Obsolete Physical Records and (B) Not Take Further Action or Incur Further Liability to Maintain Access to Additional Obsolete Electronic Records. (related document(s)4350) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
May 25 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 5/25/2023 Sustaining The Plan Administrator's and Consumer Claims Trustee's Seventy-Second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) against Hanan Lancaster. (related document(s)3280) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jun 01 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 6/1/2023 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Fifty-Third Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim of Oscar Rivera and Carlos Caso. (related document(s)3910) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jul 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 7/29/2023 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) filed by Jacqueline McCoy. (related document(s)3736) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 02 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/1/2023 Sustaining The Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Proof of Claim filed by Kevin L. Etter and The Twenty-First Omnibus Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Kevin L. Etter. (related document(s)1753, 4662, 1743) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Aug 04 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/3/2023 Denying The Motion to Compel Debtors to Amend Their Schedules of Assets and Liabilities. (related document(s)4767) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 01 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/31/2023 Sustaining The Plan Administrator's and The Consumer Claim Trustee's Thirty-First Omnibus Objection and The Consumer Claim Trustee's Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection with respect to the Proofs of Claim filed by Douglas Wain and Elisa Wain. (related document(s)4266, 1763, 4264) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 01 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 8/31/2023 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim with Respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Carolyn J. White (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims). (related document(s)2544) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Denying Claimant's Motion Pursuant to Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (related document(s)4859) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Sustaining the Plan Administrator's Twenty-Eighth Omnibus Objection and The Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-Third Omnibus Objection with respect to the Proofs of Claim filed by Helena Katrakis. (related document(s)1760, 3325) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by John M. Harper. (related document(s)2141) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Sustaining The Plan Administrator's and Consumer Claims Trustee's Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Robert Ewing and Carla Ewing. (related document(s)2840) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Sustaining Seventy-Second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Cynthia A. Summers. (related document(s)3280) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 9/29/2023 Sustaining Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (No Basis Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Ma Delourdes Ipina. (related document(s)2840) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 13 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 10/13/2023 Overruling The Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim with Respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Warren W. Pratt and Mona G. Pratt (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims). (related document(s)3461) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Nov 07 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 11/7/2023 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-Ninth Omnibus objection with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Kevin Snyder and The Estate of Mary Snyder. (related document(s)2837, 4650) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Dec 01 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 12/1/2023 Sustaining the Consumer Claims Trustee's Sixth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Documentation Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Dukadin Ristoski. (related document(s)1967) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Dec 07 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 12/7/2023 Sustaining the Consumer Claims Trustee's Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (InSufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to the Claimm of Michael Strausbaugh. (related document(s)4425, 2875) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jan 02 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 1/2/2024 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Penny Crank. (related document(s)3461) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jan 04 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 1/3/2024 Sustaining Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Documentation Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Julie Ida. (related document(s)2542) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Jan 26 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 1/26/2024 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Documentation Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with Respect to the Proofs of Claim filed by Stephanie and Larry Jackson.
|
|
GPO
Mar 01 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 3/1/2024 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Twenty-second Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim with Respect to the Proof of Claim filed by Charles Hinkle. (related document(s)2320) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Mar 04 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 3/4/2024 Sustaining The Consumer Claims Trustee's Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Legal Basis Unsecured Consumer Creditor Claims) with respect to Proof of Claim filed by James Turner. (related document(s)3461) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Mar 26 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 3/26/2024 Sustaining The Joint Objection to Proof of Claim No. 2927 and Joint Motion to Enjoin Filing of Future Claims by Tina Cook by the Plan Administrator and Consumer Claims. (related document(s)5009) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
GPO
Mar 27 2024
Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 3/27/2024 Denying Application for Final Professional Compensation for Theodore O. Bartholow III. (related document(s)1579) (Rodriguez, Willie)
|