State of California et al v. Trump et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00872 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2019 1:15 AM PDT |
Amicus
Erwin Chemerinsky
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Amici Curiae Former Members of Congress
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, NE
Washington, DC 20002 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
AALDEFF
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
58 Religious Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Bellinger, III
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Richard Bernstein
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Black Alliance For Just Immigration
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michael C. Dorf
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Former U.S. Government Officials
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Peter Keisler
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
LatinoJustice PRLDEF
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Christine Todd Whitman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Immigration Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Carter Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Christopher Shays
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
David A. Strauss
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
United States House of Representatives
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Stanley Twardy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin K. McAleenan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark T. Esper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven T. Mnuchin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen I. Vladeck
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard V. Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Bernhardt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heather Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of the Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of the Interior
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Courts Scholars
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan D. McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Southern Border Communities Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Attorney General Dana Nessel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Hawaii
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Terminated: 06/28/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick M. Shanahan
Terminated: 06/28/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court to hear challenge to Trump's emergency declaration (upi.com) |
Submitted Fri 05/17/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "Declaration." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Moti ons-General > Declaration in Support/Opposition. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:196 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ryan D. McCarthy, David Bernhardt, Richard V. Spencer, Mark T. Esper, Department of Defense, United States of America, U.S. Department of the Interior, Kevin K. McAleenan, Heather Wilson, Steven T. Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Donald J. Trump. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) | ||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
196 | 196 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Loren Flossman Addressing Treasury Fofeiture Fund by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson(Warden, Andrew) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Flossman Declaration (July 11, 2019) | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
195 | 195 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen R. Hartnett (Hartnett, Kathleen) | |
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
194 | 194 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., STAYING all outstanding summary judgment briefing deadlines and SETTING a telephone conference for July 17, 2019 at 3:00 p.m., to discuss a briefing schedule. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) | |
Set Hearing, See Docket Nos. 194 in case no. 19-cv-00872-HSG and 193 in case no. 19-cv-00892-HSG: Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) | ||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
193 | 193 USCA Case Number 19-16336 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for191 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by State of California, State of New Mexico. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) | |
192 | 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule on Claims Related to 10 U.S.C. § 2808 and the Treasury Forfeiture Fund filed by Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven T. Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, and Plaintiff States.(Warden, Andrew) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
191 | 191 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to186 Judgment,185 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, by State of California, State of New Mexico. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13498158 paid.) Appeal Record due by 8/7/2019. (Sherman, Lee) |