Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:William O Bertelsman
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:19-cv-00019
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2019
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2019 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
WP Company LLC
Represented By
Whitney G. Woodward
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Kevin T. Baine
Williams & Connolly
contact info
William G. Geisen
Stites & Harbison Pllc - Covington
contact info
Nicholas G. Gamse
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Thomas G. Hentoff
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Philip W. Collier
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Bethany A. Breetz
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Katherine Moran Meeks
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Sandmann
Represented By
G. Taylor Wilson
L. Lin Wood, PC
contact info
Todd VanDerVeer McMurtry
Hemmer Defrank Wessels PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Grunberg
L. Lin Wood, PC
contact info
L. Lin Wood
L. Lin Wood, PC
contact info
Kyle M. Winslow
Hemmer Defrank Wessels PLLC
contact info


1. Covington High student's legal team sues Washington Post (foxnews.com)
Submitted Sat 03/09/2019
Docket last updated: 05/17/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
36 36 54 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 5:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by WP Company LLC filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
35 35 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11:34 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting34 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Nicole Wade
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 4:15 PM
MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356643)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(McMurtry, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
misc Bar Status Check Thu 5:23 PM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Nicole Jennings Wade re34 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356643). (ECO)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 5:23 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re34 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356643) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
33 33 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 4:49 PM
ORDER: That the parties' joint Consent Motion32 is hereby GRANTED . Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than May 14, 2019 , and are permitted to file a memorandum not to exceed 45 pages in support of their opposition. Additionally, Defendant shall file its Reply Brief no later than June 4, 2019 , and is permitted to file a reply memorandum not to exceed 20 pages in support of its Motion to Dismiss27 . Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/24/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
utility Motion Submitted Mon 8:51 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re32 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time by WP Company LLC (TJZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
32 32 motion Extension of Time Fri 9:37 AM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time by WP Company LLC Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Geisen, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
31 31 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:52 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting23 MOTION for Kevin T. Baine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant WP Company LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and ECF Attorney Registration form to Attorney Kevin Baine
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:49 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting21 MOTION for Katherine Moran Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant WP Company LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and ECF Attorney Registration form to Attorney Katherine Meeks
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:45 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting20 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant WP Company LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and ECF Attorney Registration form to Attorney Thomas Hentoff.
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:41 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting19 MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant WP Company LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and ECF Attorney Registration form to Attorney Nicholas Gamse.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
27 27 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 8:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by WP Company LLC(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 52 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2/14/19 Washington Post Article,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Diocese of Covington and Covington Catholic High School Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - 3/01/19 Washington Post Editors Note,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Today Show Interview Transcript,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Screen Shots From The Truth in 15 Minutes Video,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Monday, April 08, 2019
utility File Submitted Mon 9:22 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review:26 Response in Support of Motion re24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
26 26 2 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 6:32 PM
RESPONSE in Support re19 MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324462),21 MOTION for Katherine Moran Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324493),20 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324478),23 MOTION for Kevin T. Baine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324519) filed by WP Company LLC.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 9:42 AM
ORDER: That Defendant's Motion for Additional Pages18 is hereby granted . Defendant is permitted to file a memorandum not to exceed 45 pages in support of its impending motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/5/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Attorneys Meeks, Blaine, Gamse, Hentoff, Woodward
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 8:57 AM
ORDER: 1) Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney G. Woodward22 is hereby granted . 2) Defendant's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas G. Gamse, Thomas G. Hentoff, Katherine Moran Meeks, and Kevin T. Baine (19 ;20 ;21 ;23 ) are hereby taken under advisement , pending counsel filing a supplement providing the necessary additional information by not later than Friday, April 12, 2019 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/5/2018. (ECO)cc: COR w/copies mailed to Attorneys Gamse, Hentoff, Meeks, Woodward(with copy of ECF Registration Form), Blaine Modified text on 4/5/2019 (ECO).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 4:08 PM
MOTION for Kevin T. Baine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324519)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:59 PM
MOTION for Whitney G. Woodward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324504)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:53 PM
MOTION for Katherine Moran Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324493)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:49 PM
MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324478)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:41 PM
MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324462)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 motion File Excess Pages Tue 1:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by WP Company LLC Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Bar Status Check Tue 4:31 PM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Nicholas G. Gamse, Thomas G. Hentoff, Katherine Moran Meeks, Whitney G. Woodward, Kevin T. Baine re19 MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324462),21 MOTION for Katherine Moran Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324493),20 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324478),22 MOTION for Whitney G. Woodward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324504),23 MOTION for Kevin T. Baine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324519). (ECO)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 4:32 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re19 MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324462),21 MOTION for Katherine Moran Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324493),20 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324478),22 MOTION for Whitney G. Woodward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324504),23 MOTION for Kevin T. Baine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4324519) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
17 17 order Agreed Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 11:10 AM
AGREED ORDER: By agreement of the parties, as reflected by the signatures of their respective counsel, the Defendant's, WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post's, time for responding to the Complaint shall be extended to April 9, 2019 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/21/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
16 16 motion Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Tue 9:22 AM
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Response Time by WP Company LLC. (Geisen, William)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 9:45 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re16 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Response Time by WP Company LLC (ECO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Mon 3:05 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WP Company LLC. (Breetz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
14 14 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11:11 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting7 Motion for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/14/2019. (ECO)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11:07 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting6 Motion for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/14/2019. (ECO)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11:03 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting5 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/14/2018. (ECO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
utility File Submitted Mon 10:12 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review:9 RESPONSE,10 RESPONSE,11 RESPONSE re8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice6 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301270)5 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301266),7 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301273) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
11 11 respoth Response Fri 2:31 PM
RESPONSE to8 ,5 per Order to supplement filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Response Fri 2:30 PM
RESPONSE to8 ,6 per Order to supplement filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Response Fri 2:29 PM
RESPONSE to8 ,7 per Order to supplement filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 4:25 PM
ORDER: That Plaintiffs' Motions to Admit Pro Hac Vice (R.5 ; R.6 ; R.7 ) are hereby taken under advisement , pending counsel filing a supplement providing the necessary additional information by not later than Friday, March 15, 2019 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/6/2019. (ECO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 1:19 PM
MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301273)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(McMurtry, Todd) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 (3/5/2019) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 1:17 PM
MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301270)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(McMurtry, Todd) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 (3/5/2019) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 1:15 PM
MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301266)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(McMurtry, Todd) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 (3/5/2019) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
misc Bar Status Check Tue 3:50 PM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to L. Lin Wood, G. Taylor Wilson, Jonathan D. Grunberg re5 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301266),6 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301270),7 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301273). (ECO)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Modification Tue 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Todd McMurtry re5 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice;6 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice;7 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Error: the Exhibit was filed together with each motion instead of as a separate attachment. Entry by attorney; Clerk added the exhibit as a separate attachment. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another and separate from the main document. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 3:59 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re6 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301270),5 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301266),7 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301273) (ECO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
misc Conflict Check Wed 9:26 AM
Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 9:49 AM
Summons Issued as to WP Company LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 9:25 AM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) This case is referred to the presiding Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, the case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial. 2) in connection with such reference, the said Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to ruleon nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrialconference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TJZ)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 8:48 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4289588), filed by N.S. #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex A-Statement of N.S., #3 Ex B-Greater Cincinnati Investigation Report, #4 Ex C-Diocese of Covington letter, #5 Ex D-1/19/19 article by Olivo and Wootson, #6 Ex E-1/20/19 article by Wootson, Olivo, Heim, #7 Ex F-1/20/19 Article "Marcher's accost by Boys", #8 Ex G-1/20/19 article "Opposed to the dignity of the human person") #9 Ex H-WP article "Most young white men", #10 Ex I-2/10/19 article "Fuller view emerges", #11 Ex J-"Viral standoff" article, #12 Ex K-WP twitter 2/14/2019, #13 Ex L-2-14-19 letter from L.Lin Wood, #14 summons) (TJZ). Modified text on 2/20/2019 (TJZ)
Related: [-]