The City of Philadelphia v. Bank of America Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01608 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2019 5:01 AM EDT |
Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BMO Capital Markets Corp
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BMO Capital Markets Gkst Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BMO Financial Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BMO Financial Group
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
JPMorgan Chase, N.A.
|
|
Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley Capital Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Royal Bank of Canada
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Banc of America Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citibank N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
390-388 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10013 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citigroup, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RBC Capital Markets LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wachovia Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Funds Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Philadelphia
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Consolidated Defendant
Fifth Third Bancorp
Terminated: 06/03/2019
|
|
Consolidated Defendant
Fifth Third Bank
Terminated: 06/03/2019
|
|
Consolidated Defendant
Fifth Third Securities, Inc.
Terminated: 06/03/2019
|
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Terminated: 06/03/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Terminated: 06/07/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo & Co.
Terminated: 06/18/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
512 | 512
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 04/03 5:40 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:511 Letter, filed by City of Philadelphia, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore ENDORSEMENT SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/3/2024) (jca) |
|
511 | 511
misc
Letter
Wed 04/03 2:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Daniel L. Brockett, David H. Wollmuth and William C. Carmody dated April 3, 2024 re: Class Members Requesting Exclusion. Document filed by City of Philadelphia, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Carmody, William) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
510 | 510
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/29 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Seth D. Ard on behalf of City of Philadelphia, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. New Address: Susman Godfrey, L.L.P., One Manhattan West, 50th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10001, 212-336-8330..(Ard, Seth) |