Giebel v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00516 |
Nature of Suit | 310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2019 2:15 AM MDT |
Defendant
Southwest Airlines Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles E. Giebel, II
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Mon 03/25 9:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties have filed a16 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), which requires no further action on the part of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/25/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
Fri 03/22 5:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Joint Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Logan, Cedric) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order
Thu 02/28 7:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the14 Notice of Settlement filed by Southwest Airlines Co, the deadlines in this case are stayed. The parties shall file their Dismissal Papers on or before 3/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/28/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 02/27 7:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Stipulated Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay Proceedings for 21 Days by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Logan, Cedric) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 02/27 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rufino Jerome Aquino on behalf of Charles E. Giebel, IIAttorney Rufino Jerome Aquino added to party Charles E. Giebel, II(pty:pla) (Aquino, Rufino) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Wed 02/27 1:21 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00516-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, ) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 02/27 1:17 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/27/2019. (slibi, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 02/26 3:34 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to9 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00516-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
misc
Memorandum Returning Case
Tue 02/26 3:31 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
misc
Order - State Court
Thu 02/21 2:43 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Denver County District Court Judge David Goldberg on 02/15/2019. (rroge, ) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Thu 02/21 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Southwest Airlines Co. on 1/24/2019, filed by Plaintiff Charles E. Giebel, II (rroge, ) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 02/21 2:31 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 02/21 2:30 PM
Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/21 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Co., filed by Charles E. Giebel, II.(rroge, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 02/21 2:28 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/21 1:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Logan, Cedric) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 02/21 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southwest Airlines Co. from District Court, Denver County, Case Number 2019CV30263. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6544817), filed by Southwest Airlines Co..(Logan, Cedric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Colorado Secretary of State Summary, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 State Court - Complaint - 01-23-19, | ||
Att: 4 State Court - Civil Coversheet - 01-23-19, | ||
Att: 5 State Court - Delay Reduction Order - 01-23-19, | ||
Att: 6 State Court - Affidavit of Service Regarding Southwest Airlines - 01-24-19, | ||
Att: 7 State Court - Southwest Airlines - Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer - 02-13-19, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 State Court - Pending Motion to Allow Discovery Before Issuance of Case Management Order and Request for Ruling Forthwith - 02-21-19, | ||
Att: 10 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint - 02-15-19 |