Data Scape Limited v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-00174 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:100 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2019 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Verizon Connect, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cellco Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Data Scape Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Mon 08/05 9:34 AM
Closing Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with closing docs. (bw) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/30 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Data Scape Limited (Kroeger, Paul) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/06 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney C. Jay Chung added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Chung, C.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/06 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X. Wang on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Philip X. Wang added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Wang, Philip) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/06 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Kroeger on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Paul A. Kroeger added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/06 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A. Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Marc A. Fenster added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Fenster, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Wed 04/10 3:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (td) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay Case
Tue 04/09 2:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation by Data Scape Limited, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Connect, Inc..(Mann, J.) Modified on 4/9/2019, to add filer (rf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/09 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Connect, Inc.. Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Connect, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mann, J.) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Tue 04/09 3:53 PM
Notice of Correction: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE PLAINTIFF HAS BEEN ADDED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT****re14 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation . (rf) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 03/21 8:43 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to and including April 22, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Thu 03/21 10:22 AM
Reset Answer Deadline for All Defendants: deadline to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to and including April 22, 2019. (lad) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/20 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 03/20 9:58 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Data Scape Limited.(de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/14 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. Verizon Connect, Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/11 9:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. Cellco Partnership served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Wed 02/27 1:59 PM
Court's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/27 1:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Verizon Connect, Inc. (lad) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/27 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, d/b/a VERIZON WIRELESS. (lad) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/27 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (lad) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Wed 02/27 12:05 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Scape Limited. (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice
Wed 02/27 12:02 PM
NOTICE Patent Report AO 120 form by Data Scape Limited (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 02/27 11:57 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Data Scape Limited. (de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/27 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11815606), filed by Data Scape Limited.(de la Fuente, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/27 12:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) |