USA v. Chan et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Case #: | 1:19-cr-10064 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 28, 2019 2:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Lionel Chan (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Muhammad Mohd Radzi (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/28/2019 3:56 AM EST |
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Lionel Chan (1), Muhammad Mohd Radzi (2).(DaSilva, Carolina) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 JS45 | ||
2 | 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi. (DaSilva, Carolina) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
3 | 3 MOTION to Seal Case as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi by USA. (DaSilva, Carolina) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
4 | 4 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING3 Motion to Seal Case as to Lionel Chan (1), Muhammad Mohd Radzi (2) (DaSilva, Carolina) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
Arrest of Lionel Chan (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | ||
As both defendants have been arrested, case unsealed as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | ||
Arrest of Muhammad Mohd Radzi in Eastern District of New York. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | ||
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi; Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Lionel Chan. Initial Appearance set for 1/31/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel K. Gelb appearing for Lionel Chan. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Gelb, Daniel) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
8 | 8 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Initial Appearance as to Lionel Chan held on 1/31/2019. Court advises defendant of his rights and the charges against him. Government states the maximum penalties and moves for detention. Defendant waives bail questions except full legal name. Matter continued. Defendant remanded to the custody of the agents in the courtroom to be delivered to the USMS. (Detention Hearing set for 2/5/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.) (Attorneys present: Varghese, Casey, Gelb, USPO Marcy.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
9 | 9 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Muhammad Mohd Radzi (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Muhammad Mohd Radzi. Initial Appearance set for 2/5/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas S. Brooks appearing for Muhammad Mohd Radzi. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Brooks, Douglas) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
13 | 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Vomvolakis Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-7524656. as to Muhammad Mohd Radzi.(Brooks, Douglas) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George Vomvolakis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Muhammad Mohd Radzi (2) (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
15 | 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi held on 2/5/2019. As to Chan, government withdraws its request for detention. As to Radzi, government seeks modifications of EDNY conditions of release, including location monitoring. For Chan, court imposes conditions of release and sets $50,000 appearance bond. For Radzi, court modifies EDNY conditions as reflected in conditions of release executed this date and continues $100,000 appearance bond as set in EDNY. Defendants remanded to the custody of the USMS to be released after processing. Warrants in abeyance to issue as to both defendants. (Attorneys present: Varghese, Casey, Gelb, Vomvolakis, USPO Walls.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
16 | 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Lionel Chan. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
17 | 17 Appearance Bond Entered as to Lionel Chan in amount of $50,000. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
18 | 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Muhammad Mohd Radzi. (Putnam, Harold) [1:19-mj-02093-MBB] | |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 INDICTMENT as to Lionel Chan (1) count(s) 1, 2, Muhammad Mohd Radzi (2) count(s) 1.(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
Att: 1 JS45 | ||
22 | 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi; Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) | |
23 | 23 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Reason for referral: Full Pretrial Proceedings as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
24 | 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Lionel Chan, Muhammad Mohd Radzi. Arraignment set for 3/4/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) |