Housing is a Human Right Orange County et al v. The County of Orange et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00388 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2019 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
The City of Dana Point
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of San Clemente
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The County of Orange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emergency Shelter Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orange County Catholic Worker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Stroebel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Housing is a Human Right Orange County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The City of Aliso Viejo
Terminated: 08/12/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Irvine
Terminated: 08/12/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of San Juan Capistrano
Terminated: 08/12/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge dismisses four of five cities from south Orange County homeless lawsuit (ocregister.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/16/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
111 | 111
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Thu 08/06 12:56 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,109 filed by Housing is a Human Right Orange County. CCA # 19-56474 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mrgo) |