USA v. Li
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 8:19-cr-00016 |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 01, 2019 12:05 AM PST |
Defendant
Dongyuan Li (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/12/2020 9:38 AM PST |
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 24 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Dongyuan Li (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-13, 14-22, 23-25, 26-28. Offense occurred in Orange and Los Angeles. (dg) | |
2 | 2 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Charles E. Pell as to Defendant Dongyuan Li; defendants Year of Birth: 1977 (dg) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO COURT OF COMPLEX CASE filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Dongyuan Li. (dg) | |
5 | 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Dongyuan Li. (dg) | |
6 | 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Dongyuan Li (1) (dg) | |
7 | 7 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Dongyuan Li. This criminal action, being filed on 1/30/19, was not pending in the U.S. Attorney's Office before the date in which the named Judge(s) began receiving criminal matters. (dg) | |
8 | 8 3 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Dongyuan Li is seeking authority for an investigative action, being filed on 1/30/19, not related to a matter pending in the Narcotic Section of the U.S. Attorney's Office before the date on which the named Magistrate Judge(s) resigned their appointment, was personally involved or on which said Magistrate Judge was personally consulted while employed in the U.S. Attorney's Office. (dg) |