Anita Chatigny v. Tenet Employee Benefit Plan et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-00400 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2019 1:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
BlueCross BlueShield of Texas
|
|
Defendant
The Tenet Employee Benefit Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Chatigny
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 4:22 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice15 . This case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its or her own costs and fees. (twdb) |
|
Sunday, June 30, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Sun 06/30 8:29 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny.(Petti, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/30 10:02 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed May 29, 2019 (Doc. No. 13), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By July 1, 2019, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of July 2, 2019. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Wed 05/29 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny. (Petti, Russell) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/29 9:15 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/28 9:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant The Tenet Employee Benefit Plan.(Attorney Jenner Chien-Nan Tseng added to party The Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Tseng, Jenner) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 05/20 9:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal:Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by the Plaintiff(s) is due. Show Cause Response due by 5/31/2019. (twdb) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Continue
Sun 04/07 10:26 AM
STIPULATION to Continue the time to answer or otherwise respond from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny.(Petti, Russell) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/12 4:03 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/04 3:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, The Tenet Employee Benefit Plan. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/04 3:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/04 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) |
|
Saturday, March 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Sat 03/02 10:16 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny. (Petti, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sat 03/02 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny, (Petti, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sat 03/02 10:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny. (Petti, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/02 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23306024 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anita Chatigny. (Attorney Russell G Petti added to party Anita Chatigny(pty:pla))(Petti, Russell) |