Edwin R. Ruano v. Raymond Madden
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01532 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 02/20 9:58 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals25 CCA # 20-55026 The judgment of this Court, entered January 24, 2020, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA ORDER32 , DISMISSED.](mat) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 01/27 10:15 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals25 filed by Edwin R Ruano. CCA # 20-55026 This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Wed 01/15 3:49 PM
Order by Judge David O. Carter denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat) |
|
30 | 30
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 01/15 3:38 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations29 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
29 | 29
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/15 3:36 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge David O. Carter for Report and Recommendation (Issued)19 . IT IS ORDERED that the Petition is denied and Judgment shall be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 01/10 11:02 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55026 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals25 as to Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (hr) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Wed 01/08 1:51 PM
OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation (Issued)19 filed by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano.(hr) |
|
26 | 26
appeal
Certificate of Appealability
Wed 01/08 1:31 PM
Application for Certificate of Appealability from District Court to USDC by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (mat) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 01/08 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (mat) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
Mon 12/30 3:29 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION23 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Request is GRANTED. Petitioner's Objections to the Report are due by January 14, 2020. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
Mon 12/30 10:42 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued)19 filed by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Tue 12/10 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, ORDERING Request for Extension of Time to File Objections submitted by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano, received on 12/05/19, is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Duplicate filing. Request was filed on 12/02/19. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
Wed 12/04 4:21 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting20 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to re REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued)19 20 . Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2019. (mr) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
Wed 12/04 10:06 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued)19 filed by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (hr) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Thu 11/14 3:16 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . (et) |
|
18 | 18
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Thu 11/14 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Objections to R&R due by 11/28/2019. (et) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Fri 10/25 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, ORDERING Writ of Habeas Corpus and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Petition submitted by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano, received on 10/18/19, is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No Court Order to file an Amended Petition. Respondent answered to Petition on 8/13/19. (hr) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 | ||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Traverse
Thu 10/24 10:50 AM
TRAVERSE filed by Petitioner Edwin R Ruano. (hr) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/10 3:12 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Edwin R. Ruano re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File14 . Name and Number Do Not Correspond. Different Name to Number. Per the BOP website, the Correct CDC# is BB6403. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extension of Time to File
Wed 09/18 3:56 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting13 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File. Reply/Traverse due 10/16/19. (mr) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 09/17 3:17 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Traverse in Response to the Answer filed by Petitioner Edwin R. Ruano. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 08/21 9:37 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION TO FILE ANSWER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN EXCESS OF TWENTY-FIVE PAGES9 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. THE COURT grants Respondent leave to file an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in excess of twenty-five pages. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Lodging
Tue 08/13 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Return to Habeas Petition (2254)10(Duarte, Ana) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Doc. 1, Vol. I, | ||
Att: 2 Lodged Doc. 1, Vol. II, | ||
Att: 3 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. I, | ||
Att: 4 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. II, | ||
Att: 5 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. III, | ||
Att: 6 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. IV, | ||
Att: 7 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. V, | ||
Att: 8 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. VI, | ||
Att: 9 Lodged Doc. 3, | ||
Att: 10 Lodged Doc. 4, | ||
Att: 11 Lodged Doc. 5, | ||
Att: 12 Lodged Doc. 6, | ||
Att: 13 Lodged Doc. 7, | ||
Att: 14 Lodged Doc. 8 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Return to Habeas Petition (2254)
Tue 08/13 3:47 PM
ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent Raymond Madden.(Duarte, Ana) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Exceed Page Limitation
Tue 08/13 3:44 PM
APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation to File Answer to Petition With Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages filed by Respondent Raymond Madden. (Duarte, Ana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the California Attorney General
Thu 07/18 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Ana R. Duarte on behalf of Respondent Raymond Madden. (Attorney Ana R Duarte added to party Raymond Madden(pty:res))(Duarte, Ana) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
6
pgs
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Thu 07/11 4:14 PM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (28 U.S.C. § 2254) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS ORDERED that: Within 14 days, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance (see document for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (hr) |
|
Att: 1 Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Blank Consent Form | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Thu 07/11 3:05 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IFP REQUEST4 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court grants Petitioner's request to proceed without prepayment of filing fees. (hr) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Wed 06/12 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, ORDERING Letter submitted by Petitioner Edwin R. Ruano, received on 5/28/19, is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.5 No letters to the judge (see document for further details). (hr) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Thu 04/18 2:33 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Edwin R. Ruano. (hr) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL
Mon 03/04 10:07 AM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Edwin R. Ruano. (et) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Mon 03/04 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et) |
|
Att: 1 CV111 Notice of Discrepancies for filing of Habeas Corpus Petition | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Mon 03/04 9:59 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Edwin R. Ruano. (et) |