Host International, Inc. v. Unite Here, Local 11, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01568 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2019 2:35 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Unite Here, Local 11
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Host International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Host International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Does
|
|
Respondent
Unite Here, Local 11
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 08/27 6:17 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Arbitrator's Opinion and Award issued on 12/6/2018 is hereby confirmed and enforced. Judgment is entered in favor of UNITE HERE Local 11 in accordance with the Court's order filed on 8/1/2019 (Dkt.31 ). UNITE HERE Local 11 may seek to recover costs in the sum of an amount to be determined by the filing and approval of the appropriate application. The amount determined may be subject to a tax and/or interest at the legal rate as provided by law. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 08/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Judgment re Order on Motion to Vacate,,, Order on Motion for Order,,31(Martin, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment in a Civil Case | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Vacate For Order
Fri 08/09 6:53 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AND RESPONDENTS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (DKTS.9 ,17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the Host Motion is DENIED, and the Union Motion is GRANTED. On or before 8/26/2019, counsel shall confer to seek to reach an agreement on the form of judgment to be entered in this action. If they can agree, the Union shall lodge the proposed judgment with a signature by counsel for Host confirming that it is approved as to form. If counsel cannot agree on the form of a judgment, the Union shall lodge a proposed judgment by 8/26/2019, and Host shall timely file any objections by 9/3/2019, in conformance with the Local Rules. (jp) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 07/11 11:00 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD RE UNION DUES DEDUCTIONS (DKT.1 ); PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATOR'S RULING (DKT.9 ); RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (DKT.17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award (Dkt.1 ), Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Ruling (Dkt.9 ), and Respondent's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (Dkt.17 ) (collectively, the "Motions"), noticed for hearing on July 15, 2019, and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7-15, the matters may be decided without oral argument. The Motions are hereby taken UNDER SUBMISSION and off the Court's motion calendar. No appearance is necessary on July 15, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc3) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/29 5:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITIONER MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD RE UNION DUES DEDUCTIONS (DKT.1 ); PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATOR'S RULING (DKT.9 ); RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (DKT.17 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court sets the hearing on the Motions for July 15, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall submit courtesy copies of all briefing no later than May 3, 2019. The hearing on the Motion will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 12:14 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (pj) |
|
27 | 27
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/26 7:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (DKT.26 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV19-01568 JAK (AFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials SS on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156.26 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 04/18 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-01568 JAK(AFMx). (rn) |
|
25 | 25
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 04/18 11:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING APRIL 23, 2019 HEARING by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: By the Court's own motion, the hearing set for April 23, 2019 on the Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Ruling filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc. (Dkt. No.9 ) and the Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Respondent-Counterclaimant Unite Here Local 11 (Dkt. No.17 ) is taken off calendar. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 04/16 11:58 AM
REPLY in support for Order17 to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Counter Claimant Unite Here, Local 11. (Martin, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Wed 04/10 4:40 PM
ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR RESPONSE DATES ON MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AND CROSS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD20 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court orders as follows: 1. Petitioner/Counterdefendant Opposition to Respondent/Counterclaimant Cross Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award is due April 9, 2019; 2. Petitioner/Counterdefendant Reply to Opposition to Respondent/Counterclaimant Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award is due April 9, 2019; 3. Respondent/Counterclaimant Reply to Petitioner/Counterdefendant Opposition to Respondent/Counterclaimant Cross Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award is due April 16, 2019. (See order for further details.) (es) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: for Order17 OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Counter Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 04/09 2:08 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATOR'S RULING 9 filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc.. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
20 | 20
stip
Reschedule
Tue 04/09 9:57 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Reply date filed by Petitioner/Counterdefendant Host International, Inc..(Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Response Dates | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 04/08 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Petition (case opening),, Counterclaim,12 filed by Petitioner/Counterdefendant Host International, Inc..(Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/26 9:53 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The deadline for filing consent forms is 42 days after service of the summons and complaint upon the first-served defendant, and within 42 days by plaintiff after service upon the first-served defendant, although the parties may file the consent form at any earlier time. There are no adverse consequences from declining to consent. All parties must expressly consent for the Magistrate Judge to preside over the action. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Notice of Motion
Mon 03/25 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATOR'S RULING 9 filed by Counter Claimant Unite Here, Local 11. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal.(Martin, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Kristin L. Martin in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/25 3:11 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATOR'S RULING 9 filed by Respondent Unite Here, Local 11.(Martin, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Kristin L. Martin in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate | ||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/18 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Respondent Unite Here, Local 11. Related Case(s): none (Martin, Kristin) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 3:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Respondent Unite Here, Local 11, Counter Claimant Unite Here, Local 11 identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Martin, Kristin) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent Unite Here, Local 11, identifying UNITE HERE International Union. (Martin, Kristin) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Petition Counterclaim
Mon 03/18 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Host International, Inc. filed by Respondent Unite Here, Local 11.(Attorney Kristin L Martin added to party Unite Here, Local 11(pty:res))(Martin, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 03/06 3:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. The attached document is a duplicate of the Notice of Motion and Motion of Petitioner Host International, Inc. to Vacate Arbitrator's Ruling at Docket No. 9. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/05 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Host International, Inc., re Memorandum in Support of Motion8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATOR'S RULING 9 served on 03/05/2019. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Vacate
Tue 03/05 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATOR'S RULING filed by petitioner Host International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF JOHN SUTHERLAND ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration OF ANGELINA PRESTON ISO, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF ANGELINA PRESTON, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration OF LAWRENCE H. STONE ISO, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B - I OF DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE H. STONE, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 03/05 3:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO VACATE ARBITRATORS RULING; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc.. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Mon 03/04 4:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/04 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Host International, Inc., re Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 03/04/2019. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/04 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by petitioner Host International, Inc.. Related Case(s): no related case (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/04 2:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc. identifying Autogrill-Corporate Parent; Host International, Inc.-subsidiary of HMSHost Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/04 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc., identifying Host International, Inc.,-Petitioner, Subsidiary of HMSHost Corporation; HMSHost Corporation-Holding Company of Host International, Inc.; Autigrill-Owns stock of HMSHost Corporation; Unite Here, Local 11-Respondent. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/04 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Host International, Inc.. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/04 2:45 PM
PETITION of Host International, Inc. to Vacate Arbitration Award Re Union Dues Deductions Receipt No: 0973-23311536 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioner Host International, Inc.. (Attorney Lawrence H Stone added to party Host International, Inc.(pty:pet))(Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A & B to Petition |