California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:19-cv-00415
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2019 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Mahet Investments, LLC
Represented By
Grace Hyojung Jang
Law Offices Of Albert Chang
contact info
Hyunsuk A Chang
Albert Chang Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire
Represented By
Grace Hyojung Jang
Law Offices Of Albert Chang
contact info
Hyunsuk A Chang
Albert Chang Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Williams
Represented By
Ross Cornell
Law Offices Of Ross Cornell Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 3:16 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire answer now due 5/10/2019; Mahet Investments, LLC answer now due 5/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire; Mahet Investments, LLC.(Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire(pty:dft), Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Mahet Investments, LLC(pty:dft))(Chang, Hyunsuk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Mahet Investments, LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mahet Investments, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 9:52 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lucas Complete Auto Repair & Tire by Son Nguyen, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 12:05 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 7:41 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Lucas Complete Auto Repair and Tire, Mahet Investments, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 6:15 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 6:13 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 6:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 6:11 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23306399 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Bryan Williams(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]