Robert Getz v. VMC Enterprises, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00421 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2019 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
VMC Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Getz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 07/17 1:27 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE26 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff James Shayler's ("Plaintiff") entire action is dismissed with prejudice, including all claims stated against Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc., a California Corporation ("Defendant"). (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 07/16 3:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by plaintiff Robert Getz.(Shahriari, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Case | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Staying Case
Thu 05/30 3:06 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On May 30, 2019, counsel for Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement". The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by July 30, 2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Settlement
Thu 05/30 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Robert Getz. (Hakimi, Anoush) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/20 1:06 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss and gives leave to amend within 21 days of this order. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (es) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 05/20 1:04 PM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS14 Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Motion hearing held. Counsel for defendant makes his appearance. There is no appearance on behalf of plaintiff. The Court confer regarding matters as stated on the record. The tentative shall become the Order of the Court. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Statement
Wed 05/15 1:08 PM
STATEMENT of Plaintiff and Defendant in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Robert Getz and Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc. re: Scheduling Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,20 . (Hakimi, Anoush) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/09 2:28 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Cause is called for hearing. There is no appearance on behalf of either Plaintiff or Defendant. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re sanctions, including dismissal or monetary sanctions, for failure to appear this date, failure to prosecute and failure to obey Court orders, for June 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 05/03 6:37 PM
REPLY Support of motion to dismiss filed by Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc.. (Schmidt, Justin) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 04/26 4:59 PM
OPPOSITION opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 14 filed by Plaintiff Robert Getz.(Hakimi, Anoush) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Anoush Hakimi in Support of Opposition to Motion and Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/23 9:43 AM
First CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying A and EE Too, LLC. (Attorney Justin G Schmidt added to party DOES(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Justin) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 04/22 6:00 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 04/19 7:17 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 14 filed by Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc.. (Schmidt, Justin) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/19 7:13 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Schmidt, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Schmidt Declaration with Ex. 1 - 16, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/10 4:39 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to VMC Enterprises, Inc. answer now due 4/19/2019, filed by Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc..(Attorney Justin G Schmidt added to party VMC Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Justin) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/29 10:27 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court hereby continues the Early Scheduling Conference previously set for April 22, 2019 to *Thursday, May 9, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.*THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/21 6:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Getz, upon Plaintiff VMC Enterprises, Inc. served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sergio Colon - Manager and Agent in charge of authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Peter) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/11 10:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Robert Getz, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing8 Order for Early Scheduling Conference for April 22, 2019 served on 3/11/2019. (Shahriari, Peter) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Reference/Discovery purs LR 83-1.3.1 (Related Case)(CV-34a)
Fri 03/08 10:27 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-02135 AG(JDEx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 8:19-cv-00421 AG(JDEx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/07 10:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on April 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. *See document for further details. (es) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/06 11:16 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant VMC Enterprises, Inc. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/06 9:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/06 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/04 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Robert Getz, (Shahriari, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/04 2:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Getz. (Shahriari, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/04 2:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Robert Getz. (Shahriari, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/04 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23311490 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Robert Getz. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Robert Getz(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter) |