Brown v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Landya B Mccafferty |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00219 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2019 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Atrium Medical Corporation
64 Wentworth Dr
Husdon, NH 03051 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Getinge AB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven L. Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/07 3:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Getinge AB Only by Steven L. Brown(Harvey, W.) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Withdrawal
Wed 08/14 1:07 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Enjolique D. Aytch on behalf of All Defendants(Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/08 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C. Chambers on behalf of Steven L. Brown Attorney Jason C. Chambers added to party Steven L. Brown(pty:pla).(Chambers, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extend Time
Thu 04/18 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Deadlines in CMO 3H filed by All Plaintiffs. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 05/22 4:04 PM
Document 1095 in 16-md-2753-LM terminated as was incorrectly spread by parties. See Document 1096 in 16-md-2753-LM. (de) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 03/12 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 3/6/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Tue 03/05 9:35 AM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1779864 filed by Steven L. Brown.(Harvey, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
MDL 2753 Case Assigned
Tue 03/05 10:43 AM
MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-219-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) |
||
notice
Notice - ECF
Tue 03/05 10:44 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (bt) |