California Central District Court
Judge:Manuel L Real
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:19-cv-01595
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2019
Terminated:Mar 28, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2019 12:28 AM PST
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Defendant
New Moa Collection
758 E. 14th Street Unit B
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Defendant
Pacific Eurotex Corp
1433 S. Griffith Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Plaintiff
C&SM INTL
Represented By
Ginam Lee
Legacy Pro Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, March 29, 2019
16 16 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 5:06 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal
Thursday, March 28, 2019
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff C and SM Intl.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
14 14 order Transfer Pursuant to GO 19-03 DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Mon 4:58 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-06216 FMO(SSx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, March 07, 2019
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 3:49 PM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff C and SM Intl..(Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11:56 AM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
11 11 notice Related Case(s) Wed 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff C and SM Intl.. Related Case(s): 2:18-CV-06216-FMO-SS (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other)5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event was selected. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices and by selecting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 3:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 2:58 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant New Moa Collection. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 11:29 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by C&SM INTL. (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11:25 AM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff C&SM INTL. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 11:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff C&SM INTL. (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 11:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff C&SM INTL. (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 11:20 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff C&SM INTL. (Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23317998 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff C&SM INTL. (Attorney Ginam Lee added to party C&SM INTL(pty:pla))(Lee, Ginam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B