California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:19-cv-01604
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2019 12:17 AM PST
Defendant
Marleen Barnes
Defendant
Does 1 to 50, Inclusive
Defendant
Randstad General Partner, US, LLC
Represented By
Haven L Claytor
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Omayra A Garcia


Docket last updated: 03/22/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 22, 2019
11 11 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 1:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Omayra A. Garcia Omayra A. Garcia(Pairavi, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 18, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-01604 JFW(Ex). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 12:53 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Wed 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
7 7 misc Declaration Tue 2:23 PM
DECLARATION of Karen Lubrano re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Tue 2:22 PM
DECLARATION of Haven L. Claytor re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Tue 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 2:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 2:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC, identifying Omayra Garcia, Randstad General Partner (US), LLC. (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. (Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV03435 Receipt No: 0973-23320080 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. (Attorney Haven L Claytor added to party Randstad General Partner, US, LLC(pty:dft))(Claytor, Haven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 1:29 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Marleen Barnes, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Randstad General Partner, US, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Omayra A. Garcia. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/31/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]