Jong Ja Kim v. Kataya, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01615 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2019 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Kataya, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
LR Little Tokyo Mall-2 LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jong Ja Kim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/09 11:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By August 8, 2019, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of August 9, 2019. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. The Order to Show Cause dated June 25, 2019 is discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Settlement
Tue 07/09 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 06/25 5:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show c ause in writing on or before July 9, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 06/25 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Having received Plaintiff's proofs of service13 14 , the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause dated June 21, 201912 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/21 3:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim, upon Defendant LR Little Tokyo Mall-2 LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/21 3:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim, upon Defendant Kataya, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/07 4:50 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 6/21/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a written response on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if a written response demonstrating good cause is not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Tue 03/19 3:38 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/19 3:38 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/18 2:55 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 3/15/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-1615 DMG (JEMx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Fri 03/15 4:07 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01615 DMG(JEMx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/06 5:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kataya, Inc., LR Little Tokyo Mall-2 LLC. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/06 5:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/06 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/05 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim, (Hong, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/05 3:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/05 3:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/05 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23321748 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jong Ja Kim. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Jong Ja Kim(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin) |