Paul Stull v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01618 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2019 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Stull
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 04/20 3:26 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar.. Judgment for Defendant as to all of Plaintiff Paul Stulls claims for relief. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) |
|
38 | 38
order
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 04/20 3:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS23 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Thu 03/19 11:01 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Generic Text Only Entry, 36 e-mailed to kat.villanueva@faegredrinker.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'Invalid Recipient - https://community.mimecast.com/docs/DOC-1369#550 [FoJesBDuO8KK7y6bW-c7vA.us386]'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 02/19 1:15 PM
The hearing on the MOTION FOR JUDGMENT23 , scheduled for February 24, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 02/05 11:28 AM
REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 23 filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/04 2:04 PM
ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II32 . It is hereby ordered that the deadline for Defendants to file the reply in support of its Motion for Judgment on the pleadings shall be continued to 2/5/20 (yl) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/03 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
32 | 32
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/03 2:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 23 filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
attorney
Change of Address
Mon 02/03 7:35 AM
NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information by Katherine L Villanueva attorney for Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Changing FIRM NAME CHANGE AND E-MAIL CONTACT CHANGE. Filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Villanueva, Katherine) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/27 4:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 23 filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/13 11:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company and designating Shamar Toms-Anthony as local counsel27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 12/10 3:43 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES25 RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS23 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The hearing on Defendants motion be continued for a period of seven (7) weeks or until February 24, 2020, at 1:30p.m. with Plaintiffs opposition being due January 27, 2020 and Defendants reply being due February 3, 2020. (lc) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 12/09 11:31 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24880542) filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Mon 12/09 8:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24880542)20 , Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24880542)22 , for the following reasons: Counsel needs to review the discrepancy on docket no. 24 and refile with correct attachments accordingly. (lc) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Continue
Thu 12/05 2:47 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule from January 6, 2020 to February 17, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 23 filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull.(Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 12/03 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24880542)22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 12/03 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 12/03 1:04 PM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24880542) filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
misc
Errata
Tue 12/03 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24880542)20 (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 12/03 11:33 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Villanueva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24880542) filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 06/19 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexandra N Burgess counsel for Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Alexandra "Alexis" Burgess is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Burgess, Alexandra) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 06/19 2:46 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony counsel for Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Adding Shamar Toms-Anthony as counsel of record for Massachusetts Mutual Life Ins. Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Ins. Co.. (Attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony added to party Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Toms-Anthony, Shamar) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Tue 06/11 4:41 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/11 4:40 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIALS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES; Jury Trial: 7/21/20 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 7/16/20; Hearing on Motions in limine: 7/13/20 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 6/29/20 1:30 PM; File Motions in Limine: 6/29/20 ; File oppositions to motions in limine: 7/6/20 ; File Proposed Pretrial Conference Order, Memoranda and Contentions of Fact and Law, Joint Witness List, Joint Exhibit List and Exhibit Stipulation, Proposed Verdict Form(s), Proposed Jury Instructions / Disputed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Joint Statement of the Case, Joint Status Report re: Settlement: 6/22/20; Deadline for hearing motions: 6/1/20;Deadline to Conduct Settlement Conference: 5/25/20; Expert discovery cutoff: 4/20/20; Percipient/Fact discovery cutoff: 4/6/20; deadline to amend:9/9/19. (lc) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 06/10 4:03 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull.. (Sessions, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 04/16 3:03 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 6/17/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Tue 04/16 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121)12 . Form had incorrect case number and Docketed on this case in error should have been under 18-8431ODW, Universal Dyeing and Printing vs Francesca's Collection. (lc) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 04/16 8:47 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (lc) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 1:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (F.R.C.P. 7.1 AND L.R. 7.1-1) filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Burgess, Alexandra) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/15 1:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Alexandra N Burgess added to party Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Burgess, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/02 4:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Stull, upon Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tiffany Phillips at Corporate Creations Network, Inc., registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Wed 03/06 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-01618 ODW(SSx). (rn) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Wed 03/06 9:53 AM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/05 4:39 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 03/05 4:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/05 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull, (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/05 4:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/05 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/05 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23322392 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Paul Stull. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Paul Stull(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn) |