Victoria Wall v. Trevor Pell, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00427 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2019 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Trevor Pell
|
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Wall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 03/07 4:33 PM
Joint REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff Victoria Wall. (Pease, Bryan) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/07 2:40 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The California Fire & Wildlife will transfer Harriett the Macaque monkey, her transport crate, and keys to the transport crate to Victoria and Richard Wall's agent at the earliest possible time for direct transport to LA International Airport. Victoria Wall will dismiss the pending lawsuit, Case no. 19-cv-427 with prejudice, and Richard Wall covenants to not file a similar lawsuit arising from the same incident. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 03/07 9:46 AM
MINUTES OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAININGORDER9 held before Judge David O. Carter: Counsel stipulated on the record that they have reached a settlement. A stipulation and proposed order with the terms of the settlement, as well as a stipulation and proposed order of dismissal to be filed with the Court by March 7, 2019. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (yl) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/06 2:42 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Trevor Pell. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/05 4:03 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to return of seized animal filed by plaintiff Victoria Wall. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 3/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Pease, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/05 2:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Victoria Wall. (Pease, Bryan) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/05 11:40 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
6 | 6
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/05 11:39 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Request for TRO Hearing set for 3/6/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/05 10:58 AM
NOTICE of interested parties previously filed as ECF 1-2 filed by plaintiff Victoria Wall. (Pease, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/05 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/05 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/05 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/05 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23316824 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Victoria Wall. (Attorney Bryan W Pease added to party Victoria Wall(pty:pla))(Pease, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix |