California Central District Court
Case #: 2:19-cv-01545
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2019
Terminated:Mar 11, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2019 12:30 AM PST
Defendant
Target Corporation
Plaintiff
Alejandra Velazquez


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Mon 8:37 AM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (car)
Related: [-]