Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. v. Transform Holdco, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | P Kevin Castel |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02081 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2019 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Transform Holdco, LLC
1170 Kane Concourse Suite 200
Bay Harbor, FL 33154 |
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Connell Foley LLP 888 Seventh Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10106 |
Represented By
|
1. | Stanley Black & Decker sues Sears over Craftsman brand (nypost.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/08/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/15 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Transform Holdco, LLC. Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Morrissey, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/20 2:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Transform Holdco, LLC. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/19 1:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transform Holdco, LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Crowley, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/13 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annie McGuire on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (McGuire, Annie) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/13 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E. McCann, Jr on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (McCann, John) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 03/13 11:00 AM
ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2019) (rj) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/11 9:02 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Annie M. McGuire, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/11 9:02 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for John E. McCann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 03/11 6:21 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for John E. McCann, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16468924. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 8 MOTION for Annie M. McGuire, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16469007. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) |
||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/08 6:04 PM
MOTION for Annie M. McGuire, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16469007. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Crowley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Annie M. McGuire, Esq., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/08 5:53 PM
MOTION for John E. McCann, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16468924. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Crowley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of John E. McCann, Jr., Esq., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/07 4:51 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Morrissey, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/07 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Patrick Morrissey on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Morrissey, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/07 12:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Crowley, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/07 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica A. duHoffmann on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (duHoffmann, Jessica) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/07 9:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MULTIPLE NATURE OF SUIT SELECTIONS MADE ON CIVIL COVER SHEET; YOU MAY ONLY SELECT ONE. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 03/07 3:09 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 03/07 3:09 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 03/07 3:10 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pne) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 03/07 3:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 03/07 3:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Transform Holdco, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 03/06 5:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Crowley, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/06 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Transform Holdco, LLC (t/a Sears). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16453355)Document filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Crowley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - License Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Press Release, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Press Releases re: Acquisition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Executed PSA, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Attachment G to the Seller Disclosure Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Brand Guidelines, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Sears Website Photos, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Packaging, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9A - Social Media Post, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9B - Response to Social Media Post |