Norris v. SI Pizza, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02093 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2019 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Victory 25 LLC
|
|
Defendant
Victory 1 Food, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Namel Norris
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
SI Pizza, Inc.
Terminated: 06/21/2019
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/04 12:28 PM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: COME NOW, Plaintiff, NAMEL NORRIS, and Defendant, VICTORY 1 FOOD, INC., a New York corporation, d/b/a DOMINO'S PIZZA-STORE #3312, who, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, and pursuant to a confidential settlement agreement, and pursuant to the provisions of Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of the above-captioned action, with prejudice, with regard to all Defendants. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/4/2019) (jca) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Fri 11/01 5:10 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 09/27 3:03 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. Any application to reopen this action must be filed by October 27, 2019. Motions due by 9/27/2019. Motions due by 10/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/27/2019) (rj) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/26 8:50 PM
AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Dismissal Deadline addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams dated Robert J. Mire, Esq.. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Mirel, Robert) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/26 8:37 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Dismissal Deadline addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robert J. Mirel, Esq. dated September 26, 2019. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Mirel, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order of Discontinuance
Wed 08/28 11:47 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. Any application to reopen this action must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order, and any application filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/28/2019) (rj) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 08/26 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
service
Certificate of Service Complaints
Fri 08/09 9:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Victory 1 Food, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Silver, Esq.. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 07/31 4:48 PM
ORDER granting22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference scheduled for August 2, 2019 is adjourned until September 6, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/31/2019) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 07/30 4:41 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Martin Silver dated July 30, 2019. Document filed by Victory 1 Food, Inc..(Silver, Martin) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/29 12:40 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/29/2019) (mro) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Sat 07/27 11:47 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Victory 25 LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/26 9:37 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Case Management Plan and Joint Letter addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated July 26, 2019. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
service
Amended Summons Issued
Thu 06/27 2:19 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victory 25 LLC. (jgo) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/27 2:18 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victory 1 Food, Inc.. (jgo) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
service
Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
Wed 06/26 9:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to VICTORY 25 LLC, re:12 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
15 | 15
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 06/26 9:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VICTORY 1 FOOD, INC., re:12 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/24 6:13 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference scheduled for June 28, 2019 is adjourned until August 2, 2019, at 3:45 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/24/2019) Initial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 03:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (ks) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/21 3:23 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated June 21, 2019. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/21 2:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Victory 25 LLC, Victory 1 Food, Inc..Document filed by Namel Norris. Related document:1 Complaint.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/21 4:25 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference scheduled for May 24, 2019 is adjourned until June 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/21/2019) (ne) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 05/20 3:43 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated May 20, 2019. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/22 1:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Victory 25 LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/22 1:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. SI Pizza, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 03/12 1:44 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/12/2019) (ne) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/07 1:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victory 25 LLC. (sj) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/07 1:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SI Pizza, Inc.. (sj) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 03/07 1:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:12188. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331. (sj) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 03/07 1:39 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 03/07 1:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 03/07 1:40 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 03/06 7:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VICTORY 25 LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 03/06 7:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SI PIZZA, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 03/06 7:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/06 7:03 PM
COMPLAINT against SI Pizza, Inc., Victory 25 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16454044)Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |